EP3090293 - LIGHTGUIDE INCLUDING EXTRACTORS WITH DIRECTIONALLY DEPENDENT EXTRACTION EFFICIENCY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/45] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENDER, David A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
HAASE, Michael A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
HAO, Bing 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
GRIFFIN, Michael E. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
LARSEN, Jeremy K. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 06 /
VICK, Karl A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2016/45] | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/45] | Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14876212.3 | 30.12.2014 | [2016/45] | WO2014US72649 | Priority number, date | US201361922217P | 31.12.2013 Original published format: US 201361922217 P | [2016/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015103188 | Date: | 09.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3090293 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/00 | [2016/45] | CPC: |
G02B6/0036 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/006 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/0068 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/45] | Title | German: | LICHTLEITER MIT EXTRAKTOREN MIT RICHTUNGSABHÄNGIGER EXTRAKTIONSEFFIZIENZ | [2016/45] | English: | LIGHTGUIDE INCLUDING EXTRACTORS WITH DIRECTIONALLY DEPENDENT EXTRACTION EFFICIENCY | [2016/45] | French: | GUIDE DE LUMIERE COMPORTANT DES EXTRACTEURS A EFFICACITE D'EXTRACTION DEPENDANTE DE LA DIRECTION | [2016/45] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/45] | 24.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2010254158 (HARTON AUSTIN VINCENT [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,8-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0035] , [0 36] * * figures 1, 2 * [Y] 6,7 [I] 4; | [XA]WO2013180725 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US], et al) [X] 1,8,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0044] * * figure 5 * [A] 2-7,9,11,12; | [XA]WO2010080289 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [X] 1,8,10 * abstract * * page 5, lines 16-21 * * figure 1 * [A] 2-7,9,11,12; | [X]US2012051088 (CHUI CLARENCE [US], et al) [X] 1,8,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0054] , [0060] * * figures 5B,6B *; | [YA]US2012099343 (ENDER DAVID A [US]) [Y] 6,7 * figures 4A - 4D * [A] 1-5,8-12 | International search | [X]US2013182457 (MCCOLLUM TIMOTHY A [US]); | [Y]US2013063980 (ENDER DAVID ADAMS [US]); | [A]US2012099343 (ENDER DAVID A [US]); | [A]US2009244690 (LEE JUNWON [US]); | [A]US2006115214 (CASSARLY WILLIAM J [US]) |