EP3092217 - A NOVEL PROCESS FOR PREPARATION OF INDACATEROL OR ITS PHARMACEUTICALLY ACCEPTABLE SALTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.05.2020 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | Change: Date of oral proceedings | 24.11.2023 | Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Davuluri, Ramamohan Rao 11th Floor, 5th Office Level, Plot No. 573A-III Phoenix IVY Building, Road No. 82, Jubilee Hills Hyderabad, Telangana 500033 / IN | [2023/07] |
Former [2016/46] | For all designated states Davuluri, Ramamohan Rao Sanali Info Park 'A' Block Ground Floor 8-2-120/113 Rd. No 2 Banjara Hills Hyderabad 500 034 / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAVI, Ponnaiah No. 3/414 Immanuel Street Tilak Nagar Iyer Bunglow Madurai 625014 / IN | 02 /
NEELA, Praveen Kumar Flat No-102 Balaji Enclave Balaji Park Town Nizampet Road, Kukatpally Hyderabad 500072 / IN | 03 /
BATTHINI, Guruswamy Flat No-403 Sri Saichandra Residency Madhavi Nagar Hyderabad 500074 / IN | 04 /
VENUGOPALARAO, Narayana Plot No. 19, Phase-II Narayana Reddy Colony Post Opp Pakruthi Vihar Appt Ameenpur, Medhak District Hyderabad 502032 / IN | 05 /
DONGARI, Naresh S/O Mohan Rao Kalakova (Village&Post Munagala (Mandal) District Nalagonda 508213 / IN | [2020/23] |
Former [2016/46] | 01 /
RAVI, Ponnaiah No. 3/414 Immanuel Street Tilak Nagar Iyer Bunglow Madurai 625014 / IN | ||
02 /
NEELA, Praveen Kumar Flat No-102 Balaji Enclave Balaji Park Town Nizampet Road, Kukatpally Hyderabad 500072 / IN | |||
03 /
BATTHINI, Guruswamy Flat No-403 Sri Saichandra Residency Madhavi Nagar Hyderabad 500074 / IN | |||
04 /
VENUGOPALARAO, Narayana Plot No. 19 Phase-II Narayana Reddy Colony Post Opp Pakruthi Vihar Appt Ameenpur, Medhak District Hyderabad 502032 / IN | |||
05 /
DONGARI, Naresh S/O Mohan Rao Kalakova (Village&Post Munagala (Mandal) District Nalagonda 508213 / IN | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/46] | Dall'Olio, Christian, et al INVENTION S.r.l. Via delle Armi, 1 40137 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 14877661.0 | 27.12.2014 | [2016/46] | WO2014IN50006 | Priority number, date | IN2014CHE116 | 09.01.2014 Original published format: IN 116CH2014 | [2017/16] |
Former [2016/46] | IN2014CHE0116 | 09.01.2014 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015104718 | Date: | 16.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3092217 | Date: | 16.11.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3092217 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IN | 03.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07D215/26, C07F7/18 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
C07D215/26 (EP,US);
C07F7/1804 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/46] | C07D215/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUARTIGES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON INDACATEROL ODER DESSEN PHARMAZEUTISCH VERTRÄGLICHEN SALZEN | [2016/46] | English: | A NOVEL PROCESS FOR PREPARATION OF INDACATEROL OR ITS PHARMACEUTICALLY ACCEPTABLE SALTS | [2016/46] | French: | NOUVEAU PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'INDACATÉROL OU DE SES SELS PHARMACEUTIQUEMENT ACCEPTABLES | [2016/46] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 05.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/46] | 20.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.03.2021
IP2 Patentanwalts GmbH Schlossstraße 523-525 41238 Mönchengladbach / DE Opponent's representative Fabry, Bernd IP2 Patentanwalts GmbH Schlossstrasse 523-525 41238 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2021/14] | 13.04.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.08.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.09.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.10.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 06.01.2023 | Appeal received No. T0037/23 | 06.01.2023 | Payment of appeal fee | 13.03.2023 | Statement of grounds filed | 19.12.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.12.2014 | AL | 03.06.2020 | AT | 03.06.2020 | CY | 03.06.2020 | CZ | 03.06.2020 | DK | 03.06.2020 | EE | 03.06.2020 | FI | 03.06.2020 | HR | 03.06.2020 | LT | 03.06.2020 | LV | 03.06.2020 | MC | 03.06.2020 | MK | 03.06.2020 | MT | 03.06.2020 | NL | 03.06.2020 | RO | 03.06.2020 | RS | 03.06.2020 | SE | 03.06.2020 | SI | 03.06.2020 | SK | 03.06.2020 | SM | 03.06.2020 | BG | 03.09.2020 | NO | 03.09.2020 | GR | 04.09.2020 | IS | 03.10.2020 | IE | 27.12.2020 | LU | 27.12.2020 | BE | 31.12.2020 | CH | 31.12.2020 | LI | 31.12.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 27.12.2014 | |
AL | 03.06.2020 | ||
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CY | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
MK | 03.06.2020 | ||
MT | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
IE | 27.12.2020 | ||
LU | 27.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/28] | HU | 27.12.2014 | |
AL | 03.06.2020 | ||
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CY | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
MT | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
IE | 27.12.2020 | ||
LU | 27.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
IE | 27.12.2020 | ||
LU | 27.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
IE | 27.12.2020 | ||
LU | 27.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
IE | 27.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 03.06.2020 | |
NO | 03.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XPI]WO2014044566 (CRYSTAL PHARMA SAU [ES]) [XP] 3 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 9, line 28 - page 10, line 24 *[I] 1,2,4; | [A] - ADAM D. HUGHES ET AL, "Discovery of muscarinic acetylcholine receptor antagonist and beta 2 adrenoceptor agonist (MABA) dual pharmacology molecules", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (20110301), vol. 21, no. 5, doi:10.1016/j.bmcl.2011.01.043, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 1354 - 1358, XP055011968 [A] 1 * compound 15 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2011.01.043 | International search | [A]WO0075114 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-4 * whole document *; | [A]WO2013132514 (RAO DAVULURI RAMAMOHAN [IN]) [A] 1-4 * whole document *; | [PX]WO2014044288 (CRYSTAL PHARMA SA [ES], et al) [PX] 1-4 * whole document *; | [PX]WO2014154841 (LESVI LABORATORIOS SL [ES]) [PX] 1-4 * whole document * | by applicant | US6878721 | US7534890 | WO0075114 | WO2005123684 | WO2008093188 | WO2013132514 | WO2004087668 | WO2014044566 | WO2014154841 | WO2014044288 | - Biorganic & Medicinal Chemistry Letters, (20110301), vol. 21, no. 5, pages 1354 - 1358 | Opposition | WO0075114 | WO03042160 | WO2004076422 | WO2013132514 | WO2014044566 | WO2014154841 | - HUGHES et al., "Discovery of muscarinic acetylcholine receptor antagonist and beta 2 adrenoceptor agonist (MABA) dual pharmacology molecules", Bioorg. Med. Chem. Lett., (20110000), vol. 21, no. 5, pages 1354 - 1358, XP055011968 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2011.01.043 | - T. W. GREENE et al., Protective Groups in Organic Synthesis, New York, (19990000), pages 76 - 79,127-141, XP055790654 | - MATHRE et al., "A Practical Enantioselective Synthesis of alpha,alpha-Diaryl-2- pyrrolidinemethanol . Preparation and Chemistry of the Corresponding Oxazab- orolidines", J. Org. Chem., (19910000), vol. 56, pages 751 - 762, XP002200364 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00002a049 | - "N-Methyl-2-pyrrolidone", Concise International Chemical Assessment Document 35, Geneva, (20010000), XP055790656 |