EP3100925 - VEHICLE AND VEHICLE CRUISE CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BYD Company Limited No. 3009, BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518118 / CN | [2016/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Dongsheng No. 3009 BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | 02 /
LIAN, Yubo No. 3009 BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Jintao No. 3009 BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | 04 /
LUO, Hongbin No. 3009 BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518118 / CN | [2016/49] | Representative(s) | Dehns Germany Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 33 04 29 80064 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/49] | m patent group Postfach 33 04 29 80064 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14880411.5 | 29.10.2014 | [2016/49] | WO2014CN89836 | Priority number, date | CN20141044581 | 30.01.2014 Original published format: CN201410044581 | [2016/49] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015113419 | Date: | 06.08.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3100925 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3100925 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60W20/10, B60W30/14, B60K6/387, B60K6/442, B60K6/445, B60W50/02, B60W10/113, B60W20/11, B60W10/06, B60W10/08, B60W10/26, // B60W50/029 | [2017/19] | CPC: |
B60W10/06 (EP,CN,US);
B60W30/14 (CN,US);
B60K6/387 (EP,US);
B60K6/442 (EP,US);
B60K6/445 (EP,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,CN,US);
B60W10/113 (EP,US);
B60W10/26 (EP,CN,US);
B60W20/10 (EP,US);
B60W20/11 (EP,US);
B60W30/143 (EP,US);
B60W50/0205 (EP,US);
B60K2310/242 (EP,US);
B60W2050/0295 (EP,US);
B60W2510/186 (EP,US);
B60W2510/244 (EP,US);
B60W2520/10 (EP,CN,US);
B60W2540/10 (EP,US);
B60W2540/12 (EP,US);
B60W2540/16 (EP,US);
B60W2552/15 (EP,US);
B60W2552/20 (EP,US);
B60W2710/0666 (EP,CN,US);
B60W2710/083 (EP,CN,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/49] | B60W30/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUG UND TEMPOMATSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR FAHRZEUG | [2016/49] | English: | VEHICLE AND VEHICLE CRUISE CONTROL METHOD | [2016/49] | French: | VÉHICULE ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGULATION DE VITESSE DE VÉHICULE | [2016/49] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2016 | Translation filed | 15.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2016 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/49] | 15.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.10.2014 | AL | 17.06.2020 | AT | 17.06.2020 | CY | 17.06.2020 | CZ | 17.06.2020 | DK | 17.06.2020 | EE | 17.06.2020 | ES | 17.06.2020 | FI | 17.06.2020 | HR | 17.06.2020 | IT | 17.06.2020 | LT | 17.06.2020 | LV | 17.06.2020 | MC | 17.06.2020 | MK | 17.06.2020 | MT | 17.06.2020 | NL | 17.06.2020 | PL | 17.06.2020 | RO | 17.06.2020 | RS | 17.06.2020 | SE | 17.06.2020 | SI | 17.06.2020 | SK | 17.06.2020 | SM | 17.06.2020 | TR | 17.06.2020 | BG | 17.09.2020 | NO | 17.09.2020 | GR | 18.09.2020 | IS | 17.10.2020 | PT | 19.10.2020 | IE | 29.10.2020 | LU | 29.10.2020 | BE | 31.10.2020 | CH | 31.10.2020 | LI | 31.10.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 29.10.2014 | |
AL | 17.06.2020 | ||
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CY | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
MT | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
TR | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
IE | 29.10.2020 | ||
LU | 29.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
IE | 29.10.2020 | ||
LU | 29.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
LU | 29.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
LU | 29.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
LU | 29.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 17.06.2020 | |
NO | 17.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5081365 (FIELD BRUCE F [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 5, line 40 - column 7, line 60 * * column 8, lines 34-62 *; | [A]JP2001157305 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-12* abstract *; | [A]JP2001191814 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]EP1375241 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0044] - [0057] *; | [A]JP2005133682 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]US2006175103 (IIDA HIROAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0027] , [0028] *; | [XYI]EP2133252 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0009] - [0012] - [0017] , [0055] , [0056] , [0066] * [Y] 7-12 [I] 3-6; | [I]JP2010179789 (NISSAN MOTOR) [I] 1-12 * abstract *; | [I]JP2012086701 (NISSAN MOTOR) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] , [0034] , [0044] - [0053] *; | [I]EP2460704 (IVECO SPA [IT]) [I] 1-12 * paragraphs [0005] , [0012] - [0015] - [0019] , [0020] *; | [Y]US2013096749 (HUSSAIN AGHA SHAHERYAR [CA], et al) [Y] 7-12 * paragraph [0099]; figure 8A *; | [E]WO2015032346 (BYD CO LTD [CN]) [E] 1,2 * page 19, lines 2-12 * | International search | [A]JP2007118751 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]KR100887797B (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD [KR]); | [A]CN201214410Y (GUILIN JIXING ELECTRONICS ISOE [CN]); | [A]CN101909912B (GUILIN STARS POWER ELECTRONICS CO LTD) |