EP3063492 - PUMP-ACTION FIREARM WITH BOLT CARRIER LOCKING MECHANISM AND FOLDING BUTT STOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Troy Industries, Inc. 151 Capital Drive West Springfield, MA 01089 / US | [2016/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TROY, Stephen P. 151 Capital Drive West Springfield, MA 01089 / US | 02 /
MONVELDT, Sergey 12 Bardwell Street, 2R South Hadley, MA 01075 / US | 03 /
HEWES, David 105 South Street Chesterfield, MA 01012 / US | 04 /
DEMAREE, James P. 198 New Road Avon, CT 06001 / US | [2018/09] |
Former [2016/36] | 01 /
TROY, Stephen, P. 151 Capital Drive West Springfield, MA 01089 / US | ||
02 /
MONVELDT, Sergey 12 Bardwell Street, 2R South Hadley, MA 01075 / US | |||
03 /
HEWES, David 105 South Street Chesterfield, MA 01012 / US | |||
04 /
DEMAREE, James P. 198 New Road Avon, CT 06001 / US | Representative(s) | Habermann, Hruschka & Schnabel Patentanwälte Montgelasstraße 2 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/36] | Habermann, Hruschka & Schnabel Montgelasstrasse 2 81679 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 14881033.6 | 29.10.2014 | [2016/36] | WO2014US62969 | Priority number, date | US201361897170P | 29.10.2013 Original published format: US 201361897170 P | [2016/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015116264 | Date: | 06.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3063492 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3063492 | Date: | 28.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.11.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F41A3/72, F41C23/04, F41C7/02, F41A21/48, F41A19/47, F41A19/00, F41A3/00, // F41A3/44, F41A3/38 | [2017/19] | CPC: |
F41C23/04 (EP,US);
F41A35/06 (EP,US);
F41C7/02 (EP,US);
F41A3/38 (EP,US);
F41A3/44 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/36] | F41A3/72, F41C23/04, F41C7/02, F41A21/48, F41A19/47, F41A19/00, F41A3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORDERSCHAFTREPETIERWAFFE MIT VERSCHLUSSTRÄGERVERRIEGELUNGSMECHANISMUS UND FALTBAREM HINTERSCHAFT | [2017/42] | English: | PUMP-ACTION FIREARM WITH BOLT CARRIER LOCKING MECHANISM AND FOLDING BUTT STOCK | [2016/36] | French: | ARME À FEU À ACTION PAR POMPE DOTÉE D'UN MÉCANISME DE BLOCAGE DU SUPPORT DE CULASSE ET D'UNE CROSSE PLIANTE | [2017/42] |
Former [2016/36] | FEUERWAFFE MIT PUMPENBEWEGUNG MIT BOLZENTRÄGERVERRIEGELUNGSMECHANISMUS UND FALTHINTERSCHAFT | ||
Former [2016/36] | ARME À FEU À ACTION PAR POMPE DOTÉE D'UN MÉCANISME DE BLOCAGE DE SUPPORT DE VERROU ET D'UNE CROSSE PLIANTE | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2016 | Search fee paid | 30.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/36] | 08.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18158480.6 / EP3346222 | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2017 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.11.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.10.2014 | AL | 28.02.2018 | CY | 28.02.2018 | CZ | 28.02.2018 | DK | 28.02.2018 | EE | 28.02.2018 | ES | 28.02.2018 | FI | 28.02.2018 | HR | 28.02.2018 | LT | 28.02.2018 | LV | 28.02.2018 | MC | 28.02.2018 | MK | 28.02.2018 | NL | 28.02.2018 | PL | 28.02.2018 | PT | 28.02.2018 | RO | 28.02.2018 | RS | 28.02.2018 | SI | 28.02.2018 | SK | 28.02.2018 | SM | 28.02.2018 | TR | 28.02.2018 | BG | 28.05.2018 | NO | 28.05.2018 | GR | 29.05.2018 | IS | 28.06.2018 | IE | 29.10.2018 | LU | 29.10.2018 | MT | 29.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 29.10.2014 | |
AL | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MK | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PT | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
IE | 29.10.2018 | ||
LU | 29.10.2018 | ||
MT | 29.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PT | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
IE | 29.10.2018 | ||
LU | 29.10.2018 | ||
MT | 29.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
IE | 29.10.2018 | ||
LU | 29.10.2018 | ||
MT | 29.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
IE | 29.10.2018 | ||
LU | 29.10.2018 | ||
MT | 29.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
IE | 29.10.2018 | ||
LU | 29.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
LU | 29.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
LU | 29.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
LU | 29.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [IAY]WO2012001287 (VERNEY CARRON SA [FR], et al) [I] 1-6,9,10 * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 12 * * figure - * [A] 12-20 [Y] 7,8; | [IA]US2861374 (HAMPTON SAMUEL L) [I] 1-6,10,11 * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 3 * * column 3, lines 5-25 * * column 3, lines 53-57 * * figure - * [A] 12-20; | [I]WO2010009725 (SCHERPF CHRISTIAN [DE]) [I] 1-6,9,10 * page 9, lines 1-2 * * page 9, lines 21-28 * * figures 1,5,6-11, 14 *; | [I]DE102013202842 (VERNEY CARRON SA [FR]) [I] 1-6,9,10 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0034] * * figure - *; | [Y]US2011283582 (HUNTER JAMES JEFFREY [US], et al) [Y] 7,8 * figures 4-8 * | International search | [A]US2010319231 (STONE JEFFREY W [US], et al) [A] 1-35 * , entire document, especially Fig. 1, 7, 8; para[0020]; para[0019]; *; | [A]US2011283582 (HUNTER JAMES JEFFREY [US], et al) [A] 1-35 * , entire document, especially Fig. 3, 4, 8; para[0013]; para[0032]; para[0033]: para[0043]; *; | [A]US4867039 (DOBBINS DAVID R [US]) [A] 1-35 * , entire document, especially Fig. 1 col 3, In 56-60; col 4, In 14-15; col4, In 15-17; *; | [A]US2011275435 (TORRE DAVID P [US], et al) [A] 1-35 * , entire document, especially Fig. 2A; para[0031]; para[0033]; *; | [A]US6782652 (ERICKSON MILTON W [US]) [A] 1-35 * , entire document *; | [A]US2006260169 (SAMSON SCOTT W [US], et al) [A] 1-35 * , entire document *; | [A]US6671990 (BOOTH VERN H [US]) [A] 1-35 * , entire document *; | [A]US2011247254 (BARNES ANDREW S [US]) [A] 1-35 * , entire document *; | [A]US6490822 (SWAN RICHARD E [US]) [A] 1-35 * , entire document *; | [A]US2012297970 (LANGEVIN KEVIN RICHARD [US], et al) [A] 1-35 * , entire document * |