Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9347737 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2016 | B2 | US2015113848 | 30.04.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361897170 | 29.10.2013 | US201414284376 | 21.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10113830 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2018 | B2 | US2016349001 | 01.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361897170 | 29.10.2013 | US201414284376 | 21.05.2014 | US201615162571 | 23.05.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3346222 | Global Dossier | 11.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361897170 | 29.10.2013 | EP14881033 | 29.10.2014 | WO2014US62969 | 29.10.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3063492 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2018 | B1 | EP3063492 | 10.05.2017 | A4 | EP3063492 | 07.09.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201361897170 | 29.10.2013 | WO2014US62969 | 29.10.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015116264 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2015 | A3 | WO2015116264 | 06.08.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201361897170 | 29.10.2013 | Type | Divisional application | EP3346222 |