EP3101906 - COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, COMMON SERVICE CONTROL APPARATUS, DATA COLLECTION METHOD, AND NON-TRANSITORY COMPUTER READABLE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2016/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INOUE, Tetsuo c/o NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | 02 /
YAMADA, Toru c/o NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2016/49] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2016/49] | Application number, filing date | 14881142.5 | 05.12.2014 | [2016/49] | WO2014JP06077 | Priority number, date | JP20140014547 | 29.01.2014 Original published format: JP 2014014547 | [2016/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015114713 | Date: | 06.08.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3101906 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q9/00, G06F13/00, H04M11/00, H04L29/08 | [2017/35] | CPC: |
H04Q9/02 (EP,US);
H04L67/10 (US);
H04L43/08 (EP,US);
H04L51/224 (US);
H04L67/025 (EP,US);
H04L67/12 (EP,US);
H04L67/52 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/49] | H04Q9/00, G06F13/00, H04M11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/49] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, GEMEINSAME DIENSTSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, DATENSAMMELVERFAHREN UND NICHTTRANSITORISCHES COMPUTERLESBARES MEDIUM | [2016/49] | English: | COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, COMMON SERVICE CONTROL APPARATUS, DATA COLLECTION METHOD, AND NON-TRANSITORY COMPUTER READABLE MEDIUM | [2016/49] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION, APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DE SERVICE COMMUN, PROCÉDÉ DE COLLECTE DE DONNÉES ET SUPPORT NON TRANSITOIRE LISIBLE PAR UN ORDINATEUR | [2016/49] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2016 | Translation filed | 29.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/49] | 20.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - "Machine-to-Machine communications (M2M); Functional architecture;00002ed211v2014 Functional architecture", ETSI DRAFT; 00002ED211V2014 FUNCTIONAL ARCHITECTURE, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE (ETSI), 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS ; FRANCE, (20130808), vol. SmartM2M, no. V2.0.14, pages 1 - 331, XP014164483 [X] 1,3,5,7-10 * Sections 4 and 5.1.1; page 18 - page 22 * * Sections 7.3.1, 7.3.2.1; page 32 * * Section 9.2.3.14; page 90- - page 91 * * Section 9.3.1.2-3, Table 9.60; page 115 - page 117 * * Section 9.3.2.14.1-6; page 156 - page 159 * * figures 5, 9.37, 9.38 * [I] 2,4,6 | [A] - "Machine-to-Machine communications (M2M); Definitions", TECHNICAL REPORT, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE (ETSI), 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS ; FRANCE, (20130601), vol. M2M, no. V1.1.1, XP014156920 [A] 1-10 * page 9 * | International search | [A]JP2008022564 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO); | [X]JP2009033536 (PANASONIC CORP); | [A]JP2012220961 (HITACHI LTD) | by applicant | JP2013521709 |