EP3176691 - APPLICATION PROCESSING METHOD AND TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2019/31] |
Former [2017/23] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Xiaohong c/o ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2017/23] | Representative(s) | Ligi, Stefano, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2019/31] | Broderick, Terence Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | ||
Former [2017/23] | HGF Limited 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | Application number, filing date | 14881587.1 | 15.09.2014 | [2017/23] | WO2014CN86567 | Priority number, date | CN201410367500 | 29.07.2014 Original published format: CN201410367500 | [2017/23] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015117316 | Date: | 13.08.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3176691 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3176691 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 13.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0486, G06F3/0481 | [2017/23] | CPC: |
G06F3/04817 (EP,US);
G06F3/04845 (US);
G06F3/0486 (EP,US);
G06F9/451 (EP,US);
H04M2250/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANWENDUNGSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND -ENDGERÄT | [2017/23] | English: | APPLICATION PROCESSING METHOD AND TERMINAL | [2017/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'APPLICATION ET TERMINAL | [2017/23] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2017 | Translation filed | 26.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/23] | 26.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.09.2014 | AL | 31.07.2019 | AT | 31.07.2019 | CY | 31.07.2019 | CZ | 31.07.2019 | DK | 31.07.2019 | EE | 31.07.2019 | ES | 31.07.2019 | FI | 31.07.2019 | HR | 31.07.2019 | IT | 31.07.2019 | LT | 31.07.2019 | LV | 31.07.2019 | MC | 31.07.2019 | MK | 31.07.2019 | MT | 31.07.2019 | NL | 31.07.2019 | PL | 31.07.2019 | RO | 31.07.2019 | RS | 31.07.2019 | SE | 31.07.2019 | SI | 31.07.2019 | SK | 31.07.2019 | SM | 31.07.2019 | TR | 31.07.2019 | IE | 15.09.2019 | LU | 15.09.2019 | BE | 30.09.2019 | CH | 30.09.2019 | LI | 30.09.2019 | IS | 30.10.2019 | BG | 31.10.2019 | NO | 31.10.2019 | GR | 01.11.2019 | PT | 02.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 15.09.2014 | |
AL | 31.07.2019 | ||
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CY | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
MT | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IE | 15.09.2019 | ||
LU | 15.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 15.09.2014 | |
AL | 31.07.2019 | ||
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CY | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IE | 15.09.2019 | ||
LU | 15.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CY | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IE | 15.09.2019 | ||
LU | 15.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IE | 15.09.2019 | ||
LU | 15.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IE | 15.09.2019 | ||
LU | 15.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 15.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 31.07.2019 | |
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 31.07.2019 | |
NO | 31.10.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2437148 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-10 * abstract ** paragraphs [0121] , [0122] , [0133] - [0135] - [0147] - [0152] - [0164] , [0165] *; | [XI] - Louis Tech, "Move Android Apps To The SD - App 2 SD", YouTube, (20120310), pages 1 - 1, URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=Fo6WQeUlm-s, (20170620), XP054977415 [X] 1,2,4,6,7,9 * the whole document * [I] 3,5,8,10 | International search | [A]US2005289478 (LANDMAN PHILIP [US], et al); | [Y]CN102479027 (ZTE CORP); | [Y]CN102685194 (MICROSOFT CORP); | [A]CN103076976 (HUAWEI DEVICE CO LTD) |