EP3108370 - MEMORY RESOURCE SHARING AMONG MULTIPLE COMPUTE NODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Strato Scale Ltd. 14 Maskit Street 4673314 Herzliya / IL | [2016/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEN-YEHUDA, Muli 27 Yakinton Street 3479264 Haifa / IL | 02 /
BOGNER, Etay 39 Even Sapir Street 6954624 Tel Aviv / IL | 03 /
MAISLOS, Ariel 1 Egoz Street 60910 Bnei Tzion / IL | 04 /
MATICHIN, Shlomo 39 Moshe Sneh Street Apt 72. 4922373 Petach Tikva / IL | [2016/52] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/52] | Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 14882215.8 | 25.12.2014 | [2016/52] | WO2014IB67327 | Priority number, date | US201414181791 | 17.02.2014 Original published format: US201414181791 | [2016/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015121722 | Date: | 20.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3108370 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 20.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/02, G06F3/06, G06F9/455, H04L29/08 | [2017/35] | CPC: |
G06F9/45533 (EP,US);
G06F3/0604 (US);
G06F3/0608 (EP,US);
G06F3/061 (EP,US);
G06F3/0641 (EP,US);
G06F3/0647 (EP,US);
G06F3/065 (EP,US);
G06F3/0665 (US);
G06F3/067 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/52] | G06F12/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/52] | Title | German: | SPEICHERRESSOURCENTEILUNG UNTER MEHREREN RECHENKNOTEN | [2016/52] | English: | MEMORY RESOURCE SHARING AMONG MULTIPLE COMPUTE NODES | [2016/52] | French: | PARTAGE DE RESSOURCES DE MÉMOIRE ENTRE DE MULTIPLES NOEUDS INFORMATIQUES | [2016/52] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2016 | Search fee paid | 13.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/52] | 13.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/36] | 12.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2012210042 (LIM KEVIN T [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0023] *; | [A]US2009204718 (LAWTON KEVIN P [US], et al) [A] 3 * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0065] *; | [A]US2012030406 (CHANG JICHUAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - TIA NEWHALL ET AL, "Reliable adaptable Network RAM", CLUSTER COMPUTING, 2008 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080929), ISBN 978-1-4244-2639-3, pages 2 - 12, XP031355602 [Y] 1-15 * page 2, column r, paragraph 5 * * page 3, column r, paragraph 4 - page 4, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 4, column r, paragraph 3 - page 5, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 5, column l, paragraph 4 - column r, paragraph 2 * | [L] - TIA NEWHALL ET AL, Nswap: A Network Swapping Module for Linux Clusters, EURO-PAR 2003 PARALLEL PROCESSING; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;;LNCS], SPRINGER-VERLAG, BERLIN/HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 1160 - 1169, (20040529), ISBN 978-3-540-40788-1, XP019001718 [L] 9,10 * page 1161, paragraph 2 * * page 1162, paragraph 4 * * page 1164, paragraph 4 * | [A] - UMESH DESHPANDE ET AL, "MemX: Virtualization of Cluster-Wide Memory", PARALLEL PROCESSING (ICPP), 2010 39TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100913), ISBN 978-1-4244-7913-9, pages 663 - 672, XP031773773 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - DRAMITINOS G ET AL, "ADAPTIVE AND RELIABLE PAGING TO REMOTE MAIN MEMORY", JOURNAL OF PARALLEL AND DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19990901), vol. 58, no. 3, doi:10.1006/JPDC.1999.1546, ISSN 0743-7315, pages 357 - 388, XP000835293 [A] 5 * page 360, line 31 - line 35 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jpdc.1999.1546 | International search | [X]US2013326109 (KIVITY AVI [IL]) [X] 1, 11, 21, 22 * par. 0015, 0029, 0027, 0031, 0035 par. 0022, 0020, 0041, 0043 *; | [X]US2012210042 (LIM KEVIN T [US], et al) [X] 1, 2-10, 11, 12-20, 21, 22 * par. 0008 abstract, the whole doc. *; | [Y]US2013275705 (SCHENFELD EUGEN [US], et al) [Y] 1-22 * abstract, the whole doc. *; | [Y]US2009307435 (NEVAREZ DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 1-22 * abstract, the whole doc. *; | [Y]US2012131259 (BASKAKOV YURY [US], et al) [Y] 1-22 * abstract, the whole doc. * |