EP3125919 - CHEMOKINE RECEPTOR ANTAGONIST AND ITS COMBINATIONAL THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microconstants China Inc. Suite 1-201 Bldg. 18 99 Kechuang 14th Street Huilongsen International Science & Technology Park BDA Beijing 101111 / CN | For all designated states Pertinax Therapeutics Inc. Suite 205 Markham Convergence Centre 7271 Warden Avenue Markham Ontario, Canada L3R 5X5 / CA | [2017/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INCLEDON, Beverly James 13306 Nassagaweya 6th Line Acton, Ontario L7J 2L7 / CA | 02 /
LEE, Yiu-Chung 79 Pearmain Court Markham, Ontario L3S 3S7 / CA | 03 /
YANG, Qicheng David 7349 Mannix Court San Diego, CA 92129 / US | [2017/06] | Representative(s) | Kilger, Ute Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/06] | Kilger, Ute Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14882875.9 | 19.02.2014 | [2017/06] | WO2014CN72239 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015123818 | Date: | 27.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3125919 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/08, A61K38/06, C07K7/06, C07K7/08 | [2017/06] | CPC: |
A61K38/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/282 (EP,US);
A61K31/337 (KR);
A61K31/404 (EP,US);
A61K31/44 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4745 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/506 (EP,US);
A61K31/513 (EP,US);
A61K31/555 (EP,US);
A61K31/7068 (EP,KR,US);
A61K33/24 (KR);
A61K33/243 (EP,US);
A61K38/08 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/185 (EP,KR,US);
A61K41/0038 (KR);
A61K45/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61N5/10 (US);
A61N5/1001 (US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/282, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/404, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/44, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4745, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/506, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/513, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/555, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/7068, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K33/24, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/08, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/06] | Title | German: | CHEMOKINREZEPTORANTAGONIST UND DESSEN KOMBINATIONSTHERAPIE | [2017/06] | English: | CHEMOKINE RECEPTOR ANTAGONIST AND ITS COMBINATIONAL THERAPY | [2017/06] | French: | ANTAGONISTE DU RÉCEPTEUR DES CHIMIOKINES ET THÉRAPIE COMBINATOIRE LE COMPRENANT | [2017/06] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 16.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/06] | 16.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/01] | 08.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2011098762 (AFFITECH RES AS [NO], et al) [Y] 1-19 * the whole document * * page 85, lines 8-13 *; | [XY] - D. WONG ET AL, "Translating an Antagonist of Chemokine Receptor CXCR4: From Bench to Bedside", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20081215), vol. 14, no. 24, doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-07-4846, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 7975 - 7980, XP055422100 [X] 1,2,13,16-19 * the whole document * * page 7978 * [Y] 1-19 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-07-4846 | [XY] - Ronnie Poon, "Blockade of therapy-induced acute recruitment of bone marrow-derived CXCR4+Flt-1+ hemangiocytes inhibits hypoxia-induced tumor angiogenesis in hepatocellular carcinoma", Cancer Research, (20080501), URL: http://cancerres.aacrjournals.org/content/68/9_Supplement/5323, (20171106), XP055422136 [X] 1,2,18,19 * abstract * [Y] 1-19 | [A] - JAMES PEASE ET AL, "Chemokine Receptor Antagonists", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (20121126), vol. 55, no. 22, doi:10.1021/jm300682j, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 9363 - 9392, XP055421895 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm300682j | [A] - J. A. GOODE ET AL, "Embolisation of cancer: what is the evidence?", CANCER IMAGING, (20040101), vol. 4, no. 2, doi:10.1102/1470-7330.2004.0021, pages 133 - 141, XP055421897 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1102/1470-7330.2004.0021 | [A] - Sebastien Hotte, "Phase I/II study of CTCE-9908, a novel anticancer agent that inhibits CXCR4, in patients with advanced solid cancers", Molecular Cancer Therapeutics, (20071101), URL: http://mct.aacrjournals.org/content/6/11_Supplement/A153, (20171106), XP055422074 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * | [A] - ANDREW X. ZHU ET AL, "HCC and angiogenesis: possible targets and future directions", NATURE REVIEWS CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, NY, US, (20110308), vol. 8, no. 5, doi:10.1038/nrclinonc.2011.30, ISSN 1759-4774, pages 292 - 301, XP055422114 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrclinonc.2011.30 | International search | [X]WO9947158 (UNIV BRITISH COLUMBIA [CA], et al) [X] 1-19 * the abstract, claims 9, 11-14, 19-20, example 1 *; | [X]WO0009152 (UNIV BRITISH COLUMBIA [CA], et al) [X] 1-19 * the abstract, claims 9, 11-15, 19-20 *; | [A]US2011207814 (RAMESHWAR PRANELA [US]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2012047339 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US], et al) [X] 1, 3-18 * the abstract, description, paragraphs 14, 18, 24, 95 *; | [A]WO2012058241 (UNIV SOUTH ALABAMA [US], et al) [A] 1-19* the whole document *; | [X]CN103003306 (AFFITECH RES AS) [X] 1, 13, 16-18 * the abstract, claims 1, 49 *; | [X]WO2013071068 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]) [X] 1, 3-18 * the abstract, claims 1-6, 10-11 * |