Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
30.06.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] |
15.06.2017 | Change - extension states | published on 07.06.2017 [2017/23] |
25.02.2017 | Supplementary search report | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
24.02.2017 | Change - classification | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
24.02.2017 | Change - classification | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
02.12.2016 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 04.01.2017 [2017/01] |
02.12.2016 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
02.12.2016 | Request for examination filed | published on 04.01.2017 [2017/01] |
07.10.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.09.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant | |
30.08.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
26.08.2016 | Change - representative | |
26.08.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.09.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.09.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication |