EP3111753 - HYDROPONIC DEVICE AND HYDROPONIC METHOD USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 570-6207 / JP | [2017/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIDOU, Tarou c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2017/01] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2017/01] | Application number, filing date | 14883617.4 | 26.09.2014 | [2017/01] | WO2014JP04928 | Priority number, date | JP20140037857 | 28.02.2014 Original published format: JP 2014037857 | [2017/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015128911 | Date: | 03.09.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3111753 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.09.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A01G31/00, A01G1/00, A01G31/02, A01G7/04, A01G9/20, A01G9/24 | [2017/13] | CPC: |
A01G31/02 (EP,US);
A01G7/045 (US);
A01G9/20 (US);
A01G9/247 (US);
A01G9/249 (EP);
Y02P60/21 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/01] | A01G31/00, A01G1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/01] | Title | German: | HYDROKULTURVORRICHTUNG UND HYDROKULTURVERFAHREN DAMIT | [2017/01] | English: | HYDROPONIC DEVICE AND HYDROPONIC METHOD USING SAME | [2017/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF HYDROPONIQUE ET MÉTHODE HYDROPONIQUE UTILISANT CELUI-CI | [2017/01] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2016 | Translation filed | 26.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2016 | Examination requested [2017/01] | 26.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.06.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP0883988 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP]) [X] 1,2,12,13 * abstract * * figure 1 * * pages 8-9 * [Y] 3-8,10,11,14,15 [I] 9; | [XYI]US2005241231 (BISSONNETTE W M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,12,13 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0047] - [0092] * [Y] 3-8,10,11,14,15 [I] 9; | [Y]JP2003038050 (NEW AGRI NETWORK CO LTD) [Y] 3,4 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0016] - [0018] *; | [Y]US5136804 (ROTHEM TUVIA [IL], et al) [Y] 5-8,14,15 * abstract * * figure 1 * * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 46 *; | [Y]US3458951 (MARTIN IVAN Z) [Y] 10,11 * abstract * * figures 1-12 * * claim 1 * | International search | [A]JPH1098961 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC) [A] 1-16 * , entire text; all drawings & US 6088958 A & EP 883988 A1 & WO 1998/014051 A1 & CA 2237722 A *; | [A]JP2012223127 (IKEUCHI:KK) [A] 1-16 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2007061014 (MISATO KK) [A] 1-16 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) * |