EP3111160 - INITIATING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SUCH A DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAAB AB 581 88 Linköping / SE | [2017/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ÖSTLUND, Johan Kollergångsgatan 7 S-702 86 Örebro / SE | 02 /
EDSTRÖM, Karl Varvsgatan 3 SE-681 50 Kristinehamn / SE | 03 /
PERSSON, Svante Inre Lötsvängen 29 S-691 35 Karlskoga / SE | [2017/01] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/15] | Nobeli Business Support AB Hyttåsvägen 10 691 80 Karlskoga / SE | ||
Former [2017/01] | Vikholm, Tommy Nobeli Business Support AB Hyttåsvägen 10 691 80 Karlskoga / SE | Application number, filing date | 14883920.2 | 26.02.2014 | [2017/01] | WO2014SE00023 | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015130198 | Date: | 03.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3111160 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3111160 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 03.09.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F42C19/08 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
F42B33/0207 (EP,US);
F42C19/02 (US);
F42B1/028 (US);
F42B33/025 (EP,US);
F42C11/00 (US);
F42C19/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZÜNDVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SOLCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2018/37] | English: | INITIATING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SUCH A DEVICE | [2017/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INITIATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF | [2018/37] |
Former [2017/01] | ZÜNDVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG SOLCH EINER VORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2017/01] | DISPOSITIF DE LANCEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 20.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 19.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.08.2016 | Examination requested [2017/01] | 05.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 12.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.08.2018 | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.02.2014 | AL | 10.04.2019 | AT | 10.04.2019 | CY | 10.04.2019 | CZ | 10.04.2019 | EE | 10.04.2019 | HR | 10.04.2019 | LT | 10.04.2019 | LV | 10.04.2019 | MC | 10.04.2019 | MK | 10.04.2019 | MT | 10.04.2019 | NL | 10.04.2019 | PL | 10.04.2019 | RO | 10.04.2019 | RS | 10.04.2019 | SI | 10.04.2019 | SK | 10.04.2019 | SM | 10.04.2019 | TR | 10.04.2019 | BG | 10.07.2019 | GR | 11.07.2019 | IS | 10.08.2019 | PT | 10.09.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 26.02.2014 | |
AL | 10.04.2019 | ||
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CY | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
MT | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | LT | 10.04.2019 | |
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | LT | 10.04.2019 | |
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | NL | 10.04.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]GB1065244 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG) [X] 1 * page 2, line 109 - page 3, line 40 * * figure 1 * [A] 6,8,9[I] 2-5,7; | [XAI]US3611939 (STADLER HANS, et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 33 * * figure 1 * [A] 6,8,9 [I] 2-5,7 | International search | [X]GB1065244 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG) [X] 1-4, 7 * ; page 2, line 109 - page 3, line 16; figure 1 *; | [A]US3451339 (PRECOUL MICHEL) [A] 1-4, 7 * ; column 1, line 40 - line 70; figures *; | [X]US3611939 (STADLER HANS, et al) [X] 1-4, 7 * ; abstract; column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 15; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3316440 (DEUTSCH FRANZ FORSCH INST [FR]) [A] 1-4, 7* ; abstract; pages 6-7; figure 1 *; | [A]US2009255431 (GLATTHAAR KARL [DE], et al) [A] 1-4, 7 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0027]-[0030]; figure 1 * |