EP3139586 - IMAGE SHOOTING PROCESSING METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2021/47] |
Former [2017/10] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Zhao c/o ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2017/10] | Representative(s) | Broderick, Terence Murgitroyd & Company Cardiff Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | Broderick, Terence Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 7th Floor, Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | ||
Former [2017/10] | HGF Limited 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | Application number, filing date | 14884399.8 | 04.08.2014 | [2017/10] | WO2014CN83653 | Priority number, date | CN201410247257 | 05.06.2014 Original published format: CN201410247257 | [2017/10] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015131483 | Date: | 11.09.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3139586 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3139586 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.09.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/232 | [2017/10] | CPC: |
H04N23/56 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/67 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/62 (US);
H04N23/71 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR BILDAUFNAHMEN | [2017/10] | English: | IMAGE SHOOTING PROCESSING METHOD AND DEVICE | [2017/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE PRISE D'IMAGES | [2017/10] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2016 | Translation filed | 02.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 02.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/10] | 02.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 22.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.08.2014 | AL | 24.11.2021 | AT | 24.11.2021 | CY | 24.11.2021 | CZ | 24.11.2021 | DK | 24.11.2021 | EE | 24.11.2021 | ES | 24.11.2021 | FI | 24.11.2021 | HR | 24.11.2021 | IT | 24.11.2021 | LT | 24.11.2021 | LV | 24.11.2021 | MC | 24.11.2021 | MK | 24.11.2021 | NL | 24.11.2021 | PL | 24.11.2021 | RO | 24.11.2021 | RS | 24.11.2021 | SE | 24.11.2021 | SI | 24.11.2021 | SK | 24.11.2021 | SM | 24.11.2021 | BG | 24.02.2022 | NO | 24.02.2022 | GR | 25.02.2022 | IS | 24.03.2022 | PT | 24.03.2022 | IE | 04.08.2022 | LU | 04.08.2022 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 04.08.2014 | |
AL | 24.11.2021 | ||
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CY | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
IT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
IE | 04.08.2022 | ||
LU | 04.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 04.08.2014 | |
AL | 24.11.2021 | ||
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
IT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
IE | 04.08.2022 | ||
LU | 04.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
IT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
IE | 04.08.2022 | ||
LU | 04.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
IT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
LU | 04.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
LU | 04.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/16] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 24.02.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5270748 (KATZ WARREN J [US]) [Y] 2-5,9-12 * column 8, line 32 - column 13, line 56 * * figures 9-13C *; | [XY]US5861936 (SORENSEN JENS OLE [KY]) [X] 1,8 * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 26 * * column 8, line 23 - line 49 * * figures 1,2,7 * [Y] 2-7,9-14; | [Y]US2001005230 (ISHIKAWA YOSHIHIRO [JP]) [Y] 7,14 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0044] * * figures 1-6 *; | [XA]US2010220291 (HORNING ROBERT D [US], et al) [X] 1,8 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0028] * * figures 1-2 * [A] 2-7,9-14; | [Y]US2013155309 (HILL SAMUEL AARON [US], et al) [Y] 6,13 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0035] * * figure 5 *; | [A]US2013194164 (SUGDEN BEN [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0042] ** figures 5-6 * | International search | [A]CN101141567 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15* , the whole document *; | [A]CN101995731 (UNIV XI AN TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-15 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN102006819 (NEUROPTIX CORP) [A] 1-15 * , the whole document *; | [A]US2013155309 (HILL SAMUEL AARON [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * , the whole document *; | [PX]CN103905709 (LENOVO BEIJING LTD) [PX] 1, 8, 15 * , description, paragraphs 0037-0042 * |