EP3121519 - CONNECTION STRUCTURE AND INPUT/OUTPUT CONNECTION STRUCTURE OF SEMICONDUCTOR MICROWAVE GENERATOR FOR MICROWAVE OVEN, AND MICROWAVE OVEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.10.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG MIDEA KITCHEN APPLIANCES MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. No. 6 Yong An Road, Beijiao Shunde District Foshan Guangdong 528311 / CN | For all designated states Midea Group Co., Ltd. B24F, Midea Headquarter Building No. 6 Midea Avenue Beijiao Shunde District, Foshan Guangdong 528311 / CN | [2021/52] |
Former [2017/04] | For all designated states GUANGDONG MIDEA KITCHEN APPLIANCES MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. No. 6 Yong An Road, Beijiao Shunde District Foshan Guangdong 528311 / CN | ||
For all designated states Midea Group Co., Ltd. B24F, Midea Headquarter Building No. 6 Midea Avenue Beijiao Shunde District, Foshan Guangdong 528311 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Feina No.6 Yong An Road Beijiao Shunde District Foshan Guangdong 528311 / CN | 02 /
TANG, Xiangwei No.6 Yong An Road Beijiao Shunde District Foshan Guangdong 528311 / CN | 03 /
DU, Xiantao No.6 Yong An Road Beijiao Shunde District Foshan Guangdong 528311 / CN | [2017/04] | Representative(s) | RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [2021/52] |
Former [2017/04] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14886039.8 | 10.11.2014 | [2017/04] | WO2014CN90741 | Priority number, date | CN201410105584 | 20.03.2014 Original published format: CN201410105584 | CN201420128429U | 20.03.2014 Original published format: CN 201420128429 U | CN201420128629U | 20.03.2014 Original published format: CN 201420128629 U | CN201420128662U | 20.03.2014 Original published format: CN 201420128662 U | [2017/04] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015139464 | Date: | 24.09.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3121519 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3121519 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.09.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F24C7/02, H05B6/64, H05B6/70, H05B6/66 | [2017/52] | CPC: |
H05B6/66 (EP,US);
H05B6/70 (EP,US);
Y02B40/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/04] | F24C7/02, H05B6/64 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSSTRUKTUR UND EINGANGS-/AUSGANGSVERBINDUNGSSTRUKTUR EINES HALBLEITERMIKROWELLENGENERATORS FÜR EINEN MIKROWELLENOFEN UND MIKROWELLENOFEN | [2017/04] | English: | CONNECTION STRUCTURE AND INPUT/OUTPUT CONNECTION STRUCTURE OF SEMICONDUCTOR MICROWAVE GENERATOR FOR MICROWAVE OVEN, AND MICROWAVE OVEN | [2017/04] | French: | STRUCTURE DE CONNEXION ET STRUCTURE DE CONNEXION D'ENTRÉE/DE SORTIE D'UN GÉNÉRATEUR DE MICRO-ONDES À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR POUR UN FOUR À MICRO-ONDES, ET FOUR À MICRO-ONDES | [2017/04] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2016 | Translation filed | 14.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/04] | 14.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.11.2014 | AL | 29.12.2021 | AT | 29.12.2021 | CY | 29.12.2021 | CZ | 29.12.2021 | DK | 29.12.2021 | EE | 29.12.2021 | ES | 29.12.2021 | FI | 29.12.2021 | HR | 29.12.2021 | IT | 29.12.2021 | LT | 29.12.2021 | LV | 29.12.2021 | MC | 29.12.2021 | MK | 29.12.2021 | NL | 29.12.2021 | PL | 29.12.2021 | RO | 29.12.2021 | RS | 29.12.2021 | SE | 29.12.2021 | SI | 29.12.2021 | SK | 29.12.2021 | SM | 29.12.2021 | BG | 29.03.2022 | NO | 29.03.2022 | GR | 30.03.2022 | IS | 29.04.2022 | PT | 29.04.2022 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/21] | HU | 10.11.2014 | |
AL | 29.12.2021 | ||
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CY | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
IT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 10.11.2014 | |
AL | 29.12.2021 | ||
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
IT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
IT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
IT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
AT | 29.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 29.12.2021 | |
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 29.12.2021 | |
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 29.12.2021 | |
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 29.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2011149275 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1,5-7,12,13 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0047]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0049]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0063]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0068]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0071]; figure 3 *; | [XI]WO2013063985 (MIDEA GROUP CO LTD [CN], et al) [X] 1,5-7,12,13 * page 4, line 5 - line 14; figures 1,2 * * page 4, line 18 - line 24 * * page 4, line 30 - page 5, line 23; figures 2-4 * * page 5, line 24 - line 39; figures 5-6 * [I] 2-4,8-15; | [X]CN103512060 (WUXI JIAXINAN TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | International search | [PX]CN103912900 (GUANGDONG MIDEA KITCHEN APPLIANCE MFG CO LTD, et al) [PX] 1-10 * claims 1-10, description, paragraphs [0006]-[0084], and figures 1-15 *; | [PX]CN203757795U (GUANGDONG MIDEA KITCHEN APPLIANCES MFG CO LTD, et al) [PX] 1-10 * claims 1-10, description, paragraphs [0006]-[0084], and figures 1-15 *; | [PX]CN203757797U (GUANGDONG MIDEA KITCHEN APPLIANCES MFG CO LTD, et al) [PX] 11-20 * claims 1-10, description, paragraphs [0006]-[0060], and figure 1 *; | [PX]CN203757796U (GUANGDONG MIDEA KITCHEN APPLIANCES MFG CO LTD, et al) [PX] 21-30 * claims 1-10, description, paragraphs [0006]-[0059], and figure 1 *; | [Y]CN202303515U (GUANGDONG MIDEA MICROWAVE & ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE MFG CO LTD, et al) [Y] 1-30 * description, paragraphs [0004]-[0029], and figures 2-6 *; | [Y]CN103563482 (PANASONIC CORP) [Y] 1-30 * description, paragraphs [0066]-[0073], and figure 1 *; | [A]CN203103501U (UNIV JILIANG CHINA) [A] 21-30 * the whole document *; | [A]CN102767855 (GUANGDONG GALANZ MICROWAVE OVEN ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [A]CN102769952 (GUANGDONG GALANZ MICROWAVE OVEN ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2007280786 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-30 * the whole document * |