EP3125161 - PROBABILISTIC INFERENCE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2017/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIROKI Keiichi c/o HITACHI LTD. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 02 /
MIYOSHI Toshinori c/o HITACHI LTD. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2017/05] | Representative(s) | Addiss, John William, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [2017/05] | Application number, filing date | 14887478.7 | 25.03.2014 | [2017/05] | WO2014JP58166 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015145555 | Date: | 01.10.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3125161 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06N7/00, G06N5/04, G06Q50/22 | [2017/49] | CPC: |
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
G06N5/048 (US);
G06N7/01 (EP,US);
G06Q10/04 (EP,US);
G16H10/60 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/05] | G06N5/04, G06Q50/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/05] | Title | German: | PROBABILISTISCHES INFERENZSYSTEM | [2017/05] | English: | PROBABILISTIC INFERENCE SYSTEM | [2017/05] | French: | SYSTÈME D'INFÉRENCE PROBABILISTE | [2017/05] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2016 | Translation filed | 21.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 21.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/05] | 05.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/49] | 12.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US8447710 (DAS SREERUPA [US]) [X] 1,2,12 * column 1 - column 7; figure 4 * [A] 10,11 [Y] 3,4 [I] 5-9,13-15; | [YA] - R.A Van Engelen, "Approximating Bayesian belief networks by arc removal", IEEE Transactions on Pattern Analysis and Machine Intelligence, doi:10.1109/34.608295, (1997), pages 916 - 920, URL: http://ieeexplore.ieee.org/ielx1/34/13337/00608295.pdf?tp=&arnumber=608295&isnumber=13337, (20171026), XP055419356 [Y] 3,4 * Section 4 * [A] 1,2,5-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/34.608295 | [A] - BENJAMIN P OLDING ET AL, "Inference for graphs and networks: Extending classical tools to modern data", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20090626), XP080331403 [A] 8,9 * Sections 3.2 and 5.2 * | [A] - Adamo Santana ET AL, "An Analysis of Bayesian Network Model-Approximation Techniques", (2008), URL: http://www.cs.ucc.ie/ccsl/GP-papers/2008/ecai08-BN-approx-Poster4AS.pdf, (20171030), XP055420068 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - PROVAN G M, "TRADEOFFS IN KNOWLEDGE-BASED CONSTRUCTION OF PROBABILISTIC MODELS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SYSTEMS, MAN AND CYBERNETICS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (1994), vol. 24, no. 11, doi:10.1109/21.328909, ISSN 0018-9472, pages 1580 - 1592, XP000477448 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/21.328909 | International search | [A]JP2007066260 (NTT DOCOMO INC) [A] 1-15 * , paragraphs [0014] to [0021] (Family: none) *; | [A]US8447710 (DAS SREERUPA [US]) [A] 1-15 * , abstract; column 1, lines 31 to 39; column 5, line 22 to column 7, line 53 (Family: none) *; | [A] - NAOYA MURAO et al., "Empirical Investigations on the parallelized Bayesian Optimization Algorithm", IPSJ SIG Notes, (20040303), vol. 2004, no. 20, pages 169 - 174, XP008184047 [A] 1-15 * , particularly, passage 2 * |