EP3127369 - ENHANCED QUALITY OF SERVICE CLASS IDENTIFIER MODIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/36] |
Former [2017/06] | For all designated states Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUAN, Zhe Shu Guang Li Building 1 Apartment 206 Chaoyang District Beijing 100028 / CN | [2017/06] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2017/06] | Borgström, Markus Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy CEF T&I IPR Administration St.-Martin-Strasse 76 80240 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 14888158.4 | 01.04.2014 | [2017/06] | WO2014CN74521 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015149271 | Date: | 08.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3127369 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/24, H04W24/04 | [2017/49] | CPC: |
H04W28/24 (EP,US);
H04W24/04 (US);
H04W28/0268 (US)
|
Former IPC [2017/06] | H04W28/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/06] | Title | German: | MODIFIKATION DES KLASSENIDENTIFIKATORS VON VERBESSERTER DIENSTQUALITÄT | [2017/06] | English: | ENHANCED QUALITY OF SERVICE CLASS IDENTIFIER MODIFICATION | [2017/06] | French: | MODIFICATION D'IDENTIFIANT DE CLASSE DE QUALITÉ DE SERVICE AMÉLIORÉE | [2017/06] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2016 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/06] | 30.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/19] | 20.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2007243879 (PARK VINCENT D [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-13 * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0084] * [Y] 6,14-16; | [Y]WO2012136708 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [Y] 6,14-16 * claim 1 *; | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; General Packet Radio Service (GPRS) enhancements for Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access Network (E-UTRAN) access (Release 8)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 23.401, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20130305), vol. SA WG2, no. V8.18.0, pages 1 - 238, XP051293020 [A] 1-16 * paragraph [5.4.2.2]; figures 5.4.2.2-1 * | [A] - HUAWEI, "Correction on HSS Initiated Subscribed QoS Modification procedure", 3GPP DRAFT; S2-087524, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20081112), no. Miami; 20081112, XP050331972 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | International search | [XY]WO2007121368 (QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ET AL.) [X] 1-6, 8-15, 18-19 * description, paragraphs [0072]-[0075], [0084]-[0092], figures 6, 9-10description, paragraphs [0072]-[0075], [0084]-[0092], figures 6, 9-10 * [Y] 7, 16-17; | [Y]US2012250660 (TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET L M ERICSSON PUBL) [Y] 7, 16-17 * abstract *; | [A]WO2014047344 (QUALCOMM INCORPORATED) [A] 1-19 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2007243879 | US2012250660 |