EP3132406 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR GENERATING AN ADVANCED STORAGE KEY IN A MOBILE DEVICE WITHOUT SECURE ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mastercard International Incorporated 2000 Purchase Street Purchase NY 10577 / US | [2017/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLLINGE, Mehdi 9 rue des Boulois 7141 Mont-Sainte-Aldegonde / BE | 02 /
RADU, Cristian Rue de Tourinnes 2 B-1320 Beauvechain / BE | [2017/11] |
Former [2017/08] | 01 /
COLLINGE, Mehdi 8 rue Cesar Franck B-1420 Braine-l'Alleud / BE | ||
02 /
RADU, Cristian Rue de Tourinnes 2 B-1320 Beauvechain / BE | Representative(s) | Hopley, Joanne Selina, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2017/08] | Application number, filing date | 14889340.7 | 02.12.2014 | [2017/08] | WO2014US68000 | Priority number, date | US201461979113P | 14.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461979113 P | [2017/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015160385 | Date: | 22.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3132406 | Date: | 22.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/38, G06Q20/40, H04W12/08, H04W12/06, H04L29/06, H04W12/04, G06Q20/32 | [2017/44] | CPC: |
G06Q20/3829 (EP,KR,RU,US);
G06F21/46 (KR);
G06Q20/322 (KR);
G06Q20/326 (EP,KR,RU,US);
G06Q20/3821 (EP,KR);
G06Q20/3823 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2017/08] | G06Q20/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES FORTGESCHRITTENEN SPEICHERSCHLÜSSELS IN EINER MOBILEN VORRICHTUNG OHNE SICHERE ELEMENTE | [2017/08] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR GENERATING AN ADVANCED STORAGE KEY IN A MOBILE DEVICE WITHOUT SECURE ELEMENTS | [2017/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR GÉNÉRER UNE CLÉ DE STOCKAGE ÉVOLUÉE DANS UN DISPOSITIF MOBILE SANS ÉLÉMENTS SÉCURISÉS | [2017/08] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 21.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/08] | 21.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.09.2020 | 16.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/07] | 10.10.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US2012143752 (WONG SHOON PING [US], et al) [A] 1-24* See paragraphs [0024]-[0036]; and figure 1. *; | [A]US2012317628 (YEAGER C DOUGLAS [US]) [A] 1-24 * See paragraphs [0055]-[0070]; and figures 5-7. *; | [Y]US2013262317 (COLLINGE MEHDI [BE], et al) [Y] 1-24 * See paragraphs [0137]-[0144]; and figures 17-18. *; | [Y]US2013282589 (SHOUP DAVID L [US], et al) [Y] 1-24 * See paragraphs [0102]-[0122]; and figures 3-4. *; | [A]US2013282502 (JOOSTE SAREL KOBUS [US]) [A] 1-24 * See paragraphs [0019]-[0032]; and figures 1-2. * |