Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016099462 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US70632 | 16.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018150156 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US70632 | 16.12.2014 | US201514778142 | 18.09.2015 | US201815879729 | 25.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9921694 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2018 | B2 | US2016224148 | 04.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US70632 | 16.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101801568B | Global Dossier | 27.11.2017 | B1 | KR20160090240 | 29.07.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US70632 | 16.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6350677B | Global Dossier | 04.07.2018 | B2 | JP2017503301 | 26.01.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US70632 | 16.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105518572B | Global Dossier | 23.10.2018 | B | CN105518572 | 20.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US70632 | 16.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3087458 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2017 | A4 | EP3087458 | 02.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US70632 | 16.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015028647 | 25.07.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US70632 | 16.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2632405 | 04.10.2017 | C2 | RU2015149217 | 22.05.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US70632 | 16.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI616776B | 01.03.2018 | B | TW201636782 | 16.10.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US70632 | 16.12.2014 |