EP3141544 - PREPARATION METHOD FOR CHIRAL INTERMEDIATE FOR USE IN STATINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.08.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asymchem Laboratories (Tianjin) Co., Ltd No. 6 Dongting 3rd Street, TEDA Tianjin 300457 / CN | For all designated states Asymchem Life Science (Tianjin) Co., Ltd No. 71, 7th Street, TEDA Tianjin 300457 / CN | For all designated states Tianjin Asymchem Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. Economic Development Zone TEDA Tianjin 300000 / CN | For all designated states Asymchem Laboratories (Fuxin) Co., Ltd No. 42 E. Road Economic and Technical Development Zone Fuxin, Liaoning 123000 / CN | For all designated states Jilin Asymchem Laboratories Co., Ltd Industrial Park Economic and Development Zone Dunhua, Jilin 133700 / CN | [2017/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONG, Hao c/o Asymchem Life Science (Tianjin) Co. Ltd. No. 71 7th St. TEDA Tianjin 300457 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Chaoyong c/o Asymchem Life Science (Tianjin) Co. Ltd. No. 71 7th St. TEDA Tianjin 300457 / CN | 03 /
LI, Jiuyuan c/o Asymchem Life Science (Tianjin) Co. Ltd. No. 71 7th St. TEDA Tianjin 300457 / CN | 04 /
SHEN, Litao c/o Asymchem Life Science (Tianjin) Co. Ltd. No. 71 7th St. TEDA Tianjin 300457 / CN | 05 /
GUO, Lina c/o Asymchem Life Science (Tianjin) Co. Ltd. No. 71 7th St. TEDA Tianjin 300457 / CN | 06 /
TIAN, Hongying c/o Asymchem Life Science (Tianjin) Co. Ltd. No. 71 7th St. TEDA Tianjin 300457 / CN | [2017/11] | Representative(s) | Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | [2017/11] | Application number, filing date | 14891345.2 | 04.08.2014 | [2017/11] | WO2014CN83636 | Priority number, date | CN201410195360 | 09.05.2014 Original published format: CN201410195360 | [2017/11] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015168998 | Date: | 12.11.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3141544 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3141544 | Date: | 07.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.11.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07D319/06, C12P7/62, C12N9/02 | [2017/11] | CPC: |
C07D319/06 (EP,CN,US);
C07C51/367 (US);
C07C67/30 (US);
C07C67/313 (US);
C12N9/0006 (CN);
C12P17/06 (CN);
C12P7/62 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES CHIRALEN ZWISCHENPRODUKTS ZUR VERWENDUNG IN STATINEN | [2017/11] | English: | PREPARATION METHOD FOR CHIRAL INTERMEDIATE FOR USE IN STATINS | [2017/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UN INTERMÉDIAIRE CHIRAL À UTILISER DANS DES STATINES | [2017/11] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2016 | Translation filed | 05.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 05.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/11] | 05.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 07.02.2018 | AT | 07.02.2018 | CY | 07.02.2018 | CZ | 07.02.2018 | DK | 07.02.2018 | EE | 07.02.2018 | FI | 07.02.2018 | HR | 07.02.2018 | LT | 07.02.2018 | LV | 07.02.2018 | MC | 07.02.2018 | MK | 07.02.2018 | NL | 07.02.2018 | PL | 07.02.2018 | RO | 07.02.2018 | RS | 07.02.2018 | SE | 07.02.2018 | SI | 07.02.2018 | SK | 07.02.2018 | SM | 07.02.2018 | TR | 07.02.2018 | BG | 07.05.2018 | NO | 07.05.2018 | GR | 08.05.2018 | IS | 07.06.2018 | GB | 04.08.2018 | LU | 04.08.2018 | MT | 04.08.2018 | CH | 31.08.2018 | LI | 31.08.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
TR | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
GB | 04.08.2018 | ||
LU | 04.08.2018 | ||
MT | 04.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
TR | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
GB | 04.08.2018 | ||
LU | 04.08.2018 | ||
MT | 04.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
GB | 04.08.2018 | ||
LU | 04.08.2018 | ||
MT | 04.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
GB | 04.08.2018 | ||
LU | 04.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
LU | 04.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 07.02.2018 | |
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 07.02.2018 | |
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 07.02.2018 | |
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 07.02.2018 | |
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 07.02.2018 | |
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - WU ET AL., "Enantioselective synthesis of ethyl (S)-2-hydroxy-4-phenylbutyrate by recombinant diketoreductase", TETRAHEDRON ASYMMETRY, vol. 20, no. 21, ISSN 0957-4166, (20091104), pages 2504 - 2509, (20091201), XP026791010 [A] 1-10 * Abstract; page 2505, scheme 1 and figure 1: compounds 5 and (3R,5S)-15d; page 2506, table 1: entry 5; page 2507, section 4.1: "5 prepared according to literarature reference 19". * | [A] - GUO ET AL., "Synthesis of ethyl and t-butyl (3R,5S)-dihydroxy-6-benzyloxy hexanoates via diastereo- and enantioselective microbial reduction", TETRAHEDRON ASYMMETRY, vol. 17, no. 10, doi:10.1016/J.TETASY.2006.05.027, ISSN 0957-4166, (20060619), pages 1589 - 1602, (20060619), XP024962054 [A] 1-10 * Abstract; page 1590, scheme 1. This document is literature reference 19 of the first document cited in this search report. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tetasy.2006.05.027 | International search | [A]JPH06107592 (SAGAMI CHEM RES, et al) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *; | [A] - MINAMI, T. et al., "Stereoselective Reduction of beta, delta-diketo Esters Derived from Tartari Acid. A facile Route to Optically Active 6-oxo-3, 5 Syn-Isopropylidenedioxyhexanoate, Versatile Synthetic Intermediate of Artificial HMG Co-A Reductase Inhibitors", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (19931231), vol. 34, no. 3, pages 513 - 516, XP000886348 [A] 1-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4039(93)85115-D |