EP3136623 - OPTICAL REPEATER AND OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Marine Networks Co., Limited 5th-6th Floor, W3C Building West Section, Finance Ave. No. 3 Street Economic-Technological Development Area Tianjin, 300457 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2017/09] | For all designated states Huawei Marine Networks Co., Limited 5th-6th Floor, W3C Building West Section Finance Ave. No. 3 Street Economic-Technological Development Area Tianjin 300457 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Wendou Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2017/09] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/09] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14891772.7 | 14.05.2014 | [2017/09] | WO2014CN77443 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015172328 | Date: | 19.11.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3136623 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.11.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/29, H04B10/291 | [2017/17] | CPC: |
H04B10/29 (EP,US);
H04B10/2914 (US);
G02B6/4427 (US);
H01S3/06783 (US);
H01S3/094015 (US);
H01S3/1608 (US);
H04B10/2916 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/09] | H04B10/29 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/09] | Title | German: | OPTISCHER REPEATER UND GLASFASERKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2017/09] | English: | OPTICAL REPEATER AND OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2017/09] | French: | RÉPÉTEUR OPTIQUE ET SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION PAR FIBRES OPTIQUES | [2017/09] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2016 | Translation filed | 22.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2016 | Search fee paid | 22.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/09] | 22.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/16] | 25.09.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.11.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 29.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0954125 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1,12 * paragraphs [0017] , [0 18] , [0 29] * * figures 2, 4 * [I] 2-11,13-15; | [A]EP1018666 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0065] , [0066] ** figures 32, 35 *; | [I]US2004201882 (KIKUCHI NOBUHIKO [JP]) [I] 1-15 * figure 15 * * paragraphs [0215] , [ 217] * | International search | [A]WO03069812 (PIRELLI SUBMARINE TELECOM SYSTEMS ITALIA SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-18* the whole document *; | [A]CN101997612 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]CN103701522 (ACCELINK TECHNOLOGIES CO LTD) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]CN103746283 (STARWAY LASER INC) [A] 1-18 * the whole document * |