03.04.2020 |
Refusal of application |
published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] |
16.12.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
02.12.2019 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
02.12.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.08.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.07.2019 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
19.04.2019 |
First examination report |
|
13.04.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.11.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
22.09.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
16.05.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.03.2018 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
02.03.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
02.03.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
14.07.2017 |
Change - extension states |
published on 16.08.2017 [2017/33] |
26.05.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.02.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
17.02.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
17.02.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
23.12.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.12.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.12.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.12.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.12.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
16.11.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
16.11.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.11.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.11.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|