Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015173608 | Global Dossier | 19.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014IB61404 | 13.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10087346 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2018 | B2 | US2017096587 | 06.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014IB61404 | 13.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106715630 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014IB61404 | 13.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3143094 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2018 | A4 | EP3143094 | 22.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014IB61404 | 13.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112016026541 | 25.01.2022 | B1 | BR112016026541 | 15.08.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2014IB61404 | 13.05.2014 |