EP3139507 - PARAMETER ACQUIRING METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2017/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LV, Jie Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Xiaolong Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2017/10] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/49] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2017/10] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14892453.3 | 20.05.2014 | [2017/10] | WO2014CN77893 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015176232 | Date: | 26.11.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3139507 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3139507 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.11.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04B3/00, H04B3/46 | [2017/13] | CPC: |
H04B3/46 (EP,US);
H04L43/0847 (US);
H04B10/0793 (US);
H04B17/391 (EP,US);
H04B3/00 (EP,US);
H04L1/0036 (US);
H04L1/203 (US);
H04L1/206 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0066 (US);
H04Q2011/0083 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/10] | H04B3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERFASSUNG VON PARAMETERN | [2017/10] | English: | PARAMETER ACQUIRING METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2017/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'ACQUISITION DE PARAMÈTRE | [2017/10] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2016 | Translation filed | 18.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2016 | Search fee paid | 18.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/10] | 18.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 26.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.05.2014 | AL | 04.12.2019 | AT | 04.12.2019 | CY | 04.12.2019 | CZ | 04.12.2019 | DK | 04.12.2019 | EE | 04.12.2019 | ES | 04.12.2019 | FI | 04.12.2019 | HR | 04.12.2019 | IT | 04.12.2019 | LT | 04.12.2019 | LV | 04.12.2019 | MC | 04.12.2019 | MK | 04.12.2019 | MT | 04.12.2019 | NL | 04.12.2019 | PL | 04.12.2019 | RO | 04.12.2019 | RS | 04.12.2019 | SE | 04.12.2019 | SI | 04.12.2019 | SK | 04.12.2019 | SM | 04.12.2019 | TR | 04.12.2019 | BG | 04.03.2020 | NO | 04.03.2020 | GR | 05.03.2020 | IS | 04.04.2020 | PT | 29.04.2020 | IE | 20.05.2020 | LU | 20.05.2020 | BE | 31.05.2020 | CH | 31.05.2020 | FR | 31.05.2020 | LI | 31.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 20.05.2014 | |
AL | 04.12.2019 | ||
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
CY | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
IT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
MT | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
TR | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
IE | 20.05.2020 | ||
LU | 20.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
IT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
IE | 20.05.2020 | ||
LU | 20.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
IT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
IE | 20.05.2020 | ||
LU | 20.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
IT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LU | 20.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
IT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 04.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6215818 (VELEZ EDGAR [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,10,12-14,17 * figures 1,2 * * column 3, line 36 - column 5, line 4 *[I] 3; | [XI]US7142609 (TERREAULT GERARD [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,11-13,15-17 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 30 * * column 9, line 20 - column 10, line 22 * * column 11, line 1 - column 12, line 39 * [I] 3-10,14,18,19 | International search | [A]CN101162970 (ACTERNA LLC [US]) [A] 1-24* , the whole document *; | [X]CN101373989 (STARPOINTCOMM LTD [CN]) [X] 1-2, 5, 14-24 * , description, page 1, paragraph 2, page 7, paragraphs 2-3, page 8, paragraph 2 to page 11, paragraph 3, and figure 1 *; | [A]CN102318302 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-24 * , the whole document * |