EP3154487 - ABSORBENT ARTICLE EXHIBITING CONTROLLED DEFORMATION IN USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sca Hygiene Products AB 405 03 Göteborg / SE | [2017/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESPING ÖSTLIN, Hanna c/o SCA Hygiene Products AB S-405 03 Göteborg / SE | 02 /
GUIDOTTI, Edward c/o SCA Hygiene Products AB S-405 03 Göteborg / SE | [2017/16] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Göteborg / SE | [2017/16] | Application number, filing date | 14894269.1 | 13.06.2014 | [2017/16] | WO2014SE50717 | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015190963 | Date: | 17.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3154487 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 17.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/536, A61F13/47, A61F13/49, A61F13/511, A61F13/533 | [2017/16] | CPC: |
A61F13/49001 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/536 (RU);
A61F13/53 (US);
A61F13/45 (KR);
A61F13/4704 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/49413 (US);
A61F2013/4512 (KR);
A61F2013/455 (KR);
A61F2013/530007 (US);
A61F2013/530875 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/16] | Title | German: | ABSORBIERENDER ARTIKEL MIT KONTROLLIERTER VERFORMUNG BEI DER VERWENDUNG | [2017/16] | English: | ABSORBENT ARTICLE EXHIBITING CONTROLLED DEFORMATION IN USE | [2017/16] | French: | ARTICLE ABSORBANT PRÉSENTANT UNE DÉFORMATION CONTRÔLÉE EN UTILISATION | [2017/16] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2016 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/16] | 10.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/47] | 19.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2296437 (MOELNLYCKE AB [SE]); | [A]WO2011105108 (UNICHARM CORP [JP], et al); | [A]WO2012086210 (UNICHARM CORP [JP], et al); | [A]US2012220972 (KAWAMURA KOJI [JP], et al) | International search | [A]US5197959 (BUELL KENNETH B [US]); | [Y]GB2296437 (MOELNLYCKE AB [SE]); | [A]EP1723939 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]); | [A]JP2008284190 (OJI NEPIA KK, et al); | [Y]WO2011105108 (UNICHARM CORP [JP], et al); | [A]WO2012005249 (KAO CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2012086210 (UNICHARM CORP [JP], et al); | [A]WO2012086487 (KAO CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]US2012220972 (KAWAMURA KOJI [JP], et al); | [A]US2012289923 (WATABE YOSHIHISA [JP], et al); | [A]EP2612636 (DAIO SEISHI KK [JP]); | [A]EP2659872 (KAO CORP [JP]); | [E]WO2014104952 (SCA HYGIENE PROD AB [SE]) |