EP3155853 - SPATIAL MULTIPLE ACCESS UPLINK FOR WIRELESS LOCAL AREA NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2017/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARYAFAR, Ehsan 2200 Mission College Blvd. Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | 02 /
DOOSTNEJAD, Roya 1689 Stevens Pl. Unit B Los Altos, California 94024 / US | 03 /
TALWAR, Shilpa 22780 Stevens Creek Blvd. Cupertino, California 95014 / US | [2017/16] | Representative(s) | HGF Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/16] | HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 14894368.1 | 11.06.2014 | [2017/16] | WO2014US41858 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015191059 | Date: | 17.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3155853 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04W88/08, H04W74/08, H04J11/00, H04B7/0452 | [2018/07] | CPC: |
H04W74/006 (EP,US);
H04W74/08 (US);
H04B7/0452 (EP,US);
H04B7/0628 (EP,US);
H04W74/02 (EP,US);
H04W74/0816 (EP,US);
H04W84/12 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/16] | H04W72/04, H04W88/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/16] | Title | German: | RÄUMLICHER MEHRFACHZUGANGS-UPLINK FÜR DRAHTLOSE LOKALE NETZWERKE | [2017/16] | English: | SPATIAL MULTIPLE ACCESS UPLINK FOR WIRELESS LOCAL AREA NETWORKS | [2017/16] | French: | LIAISON MONTANTE À ACCÈS MULTIPLES SPATIALE POUR DES RÉSEAUX LOCAUX SANS FIL | [2017/16] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/16] | 26.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/07] | 18.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - RUIZHI LIAO ET AL, "DCF/USDMA: Enhanced DCF for uplink SDMA transmissions in WLANs", WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS AND MOBILE COMPUTING CONFERENCE (IWCMC), 2012 8TH INTERNATIONAL, IEEE, (20120827), doi:10.1109/IWCMC.2012.6314214, ISBN 978-1-4577-1378-1, pages 263 - 268, XP032253313 [A] 1-15 * Section III;; figures 3-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IWCMC.2012.6314214 | [A] - KUN TAN ET AL, "SAM", NATIONAL LAB FOR INFORMATION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY/ MOBICOM'09, ACM, BEIJING,CHINA, (20090920), doi:10.1145/1614320.1614327, ISBN 978-1-60558-702-8, pages 49 - 60, XP058288595 [A] 1-15 * Section 4;; figure 12 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1614320.1614327 | [A] - LI HAOCHAO ET AL, "CUTS: Improving Channel Utilization in Both Time and Spatial Domain in WLANs", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PARALLEL AND DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, US, vol. 25, no. 6, doi:10.1109/TPDS.2013.165, ISSN 1045-9219, (20140601), pages 1413 - 1423, (20140512), XP011548037 [A] 1-15 * Section 3;; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPDS.2013.165 | [A] - PENG XUAN ZHENG ET AL, "Multipacket Reception in Wireless Local Area Networks", COMMUNICATIONS, 2006. ICC '06. IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PI, (20060601), ISBN 978-1-4244-0354-7, pages 3670 - 3675, XP031025888 [A] 1-15 * Section III;; figure 2 * | International search | [A]US2006274776 (MALIK RAHUL [SG], et al) [A] 1-25 * See paragraphs [65], [70]. *; | [A]WO2010025268 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * See paragraphs [9], [11], [12]; and claim 1. *; | [A]US2011122788 (SOMBRUTZKI ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1-25* See paragraphs [19], [20]; and claims 1, 6, 10. *; | [A]WO2011085403 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * See paragraphs [80], [89], [90]; and claims 1, 7. *; | [A]EP2512198 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-25 * See paragraphs [37], [82], [83]; and claims 19, 20. * |