EP3162226 - ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lin, Guangrong Shaer Lantian Science Park A1 Building Ditang Road Shajing Town, Bao'an District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2017/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/18] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon 4a rue de l'Industrie 67450 Mundolsheim / FR | [2017/18] | Application number, filing date | 14895852.3 | 04.12.2014 | [2017/18] | WO2014CN93009 | Priority number, date | CN201420341430U | 25.06.2014 Original published format: CN 201420341430 U | [2017/18] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015196737 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3162226 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3162226 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A24F47/00, H05B3/03 | [2018/13] | CPC: |
A24F40/40 (EP,US);
H05B3/03 (US);
A24F40/10 (EP,US);
H05B2203/021 (US)
|
Former IPC [2017/18] | A24F47/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE ZIGARETTE | [2017/18] | English: | ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE | [2017/18] | French: | CIGARETTE ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2017/18] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2016 | Translation filed | 22.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/18] | 22.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.12.2014 | AL | 08.08.2018 | AT | 08.08.2018 | CY | 08.08.2018 | DK | 08.08.2018 | EE | 08.08.2018 | ES | 08.08.2018 | FI | 08.08.2018 | HR | 08.08.2018 | LT | 08.08.2018 | LV | 08.08.2018 | MC | 08.08.2018 | MK | 08.08.2018 | NL | 08.08.2018 | PT | 08.08.2018 | RS | 08.08.2018 | SE | 08.08.2018 | SI | 08.08.2018 | SK | 08.08.2018 | SM | 08.08.2018 | TR | 08.08.2018 | BG | 08.11.2018 | NO | 08.11.2018 | LU | 04.12.2018 | MT | 04.12.2018 | IS | 08.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PT | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
LU | 04.12.2018 | ||
MT | 04.12.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
LU | 04.12.2018 | ||
MT | 04.12.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
LU | 04.12.2018 | ||
MT | 04.12.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
LU | 04.12.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
LU | 04.12.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
LU | 04.12.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
LU | 04.12.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 08.08.2018 | |
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 08.08.2018 | |
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 08.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2013081642 (SAFARI ROBERT [US]) [I] 1-8* paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0039] *; | [I]CA2868914 (KIMREE HI TECH INC [VG]) [I] 1-8 * page 6 - page 15 *; | [I]US2014041655 (BARRON ANTHONY [US], et al) [I] 1-8 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0094] * | International search | [X]CN201430916Y (ZHEQI LIU) [X] 1-8 * , description, pages 1-7, claims 1-10. and figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2012006346 (INAGAKI MICHIHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-8* , the whole document *; | [A]WO2013159245 (RUYAN INVEST HOLDINGS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-8 * , the whole document *; | [X]CN203314099U (LIU QIUMING) [X] 1-8 * , description, pages 1-5, claims 1-10. and figures 1-9 *; | [PX]CN203952447U (LIN GUANGRONG) [PX] 1-2 * , claims 1-8 * |