Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9900120 | Global Dossier | 20.02.2018 | B2 | US2017195076 | 06.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201410303131 | 26.06.2014 | WO2014CN90187 | 03.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3163786 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2019 | B1 | EP3163786 | 05.07.2017 | A4 | EP3163786 | 03.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201410303131 | 26.06.2014 | WO2014CN90187 | 03.11.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015196685 | Global Dossier | 30.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201410303131 | 26.06.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105323054B | Global Dossier | 17.05.2019 | B | CN105323054 | 10.02.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201410303131 | 26.06.2014 |