EP3163786 - CLOCK SYNCHRONIZATION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2019/49] |
Former [2017/18] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Lilin ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
YAN, Shengnan ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Yangfeng ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2017/18] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/49] | Broderick, Terence Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | ||
Former [2017/18] | HGF Limited 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | Application number, filing date | 14896071.9 | 03.11.2014 | [2017/18] | WO2014CN90187 | Priority number, date | CN201410303131 | 26.06.2014 Original published format: CN201410303131 | [2017/18] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015196685 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3163786 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3163786 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.12.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/06, G06F9/48, // G06F1/14 | [2017/27] | CPC: |
H04J3/0697 (EP,US);
G06F1/12 (EP,US);
G06F1/14 (EP,US);
H04J3/0667 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/18] | H04L7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR TAKTSYNCHRONISATION | [2017/18] | English: | CLOCK SYNCHRONIZATION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2017/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE SYNCHRONISATION D'HORLOGE | [2017/18] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2017 | Translation filed | 25.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/18] | 25.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.11.2014 | AL | 04.12.2019 | AT | 04.12.2019 | CY | 04.12.2019 | CZ | 04.12.2019 | DK | 04.12.2019 | EE | 04.12.2019 | ES | 04.12.2019 | FI | 04.12.2019 | HR | 04.12.2019 | IT | 04.12.2019 | LT | 04.12.2019 | LV | 04.12.2019 | MC | 04.12.2019 | MK | 04.12.2019 | MT | 04.12.2019 | NL | 04.12.2019 | PL | 04.12.2019 | RO | 04.12.2019 | RS | 04.12.2019 | SE | 04.12.2019 | SI | 04.12.2019 | SK | 04.12.2019 | SM | 04.12.2019 | TR | 04.12.2019 | BG | 04.03.2020 | NO | 04.03.2020 | GR | 05.03.2020 | IS | 04.04.2020 | PT | 29.04.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 03.11.2014 | |
AL | 04.12.2019 | ||
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
CY | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
IT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
MT | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
TR | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
IT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
IT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
AT | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 04.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2009310726 (ALANKRY YARON [IL], et al) [X] 1-3,7,8 * figures 3,5 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0077] * [Y] 4,5,9,10 [I] 6,11; | [Y]WO2006093460 (OMICRON CETI AB [SE], et al) [Y] 4,5,9,10 * page 5, line 24 - line 29; figures 1,2 * * page 4, line 33 - page 5, line 7 *; | [XI]US8549341 (SHAHID AHMED [US], et al) [X] 1,7 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 7 * * column 4, line 31 - line 41 * * column 5, line 6 - column 6, line 7 * * figures 1-3,5 * [I] 2-6,8-11; | [A]US2014064297 (HIROTA MASAKI [JP]) [A] 1-11 * figures 1,3,8,9,12 * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0074] * | [Y] - CALDER B R ET AL, "Ultraprecise Absolute Time Synchronization for Distributed Acquisition Systems", IEEE JOURNAL OF OCEANIC ENGINEERING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20071001), vol. 32, no. 4, ISSN 0364-9059, pages 772 - 785, XP011203624 [Y] 4,5,9,10 * abstract * * page 777, column r, paragraph l * * page 781, column r, paragraph 1 * | [X] - BUTNER S E ET AL, "Nanosecond-scale even synchronization over local-area networks", LOCAL COMPUTER NETWORKS, 2002. PROCEEDINGS. LCN 2002. 27TH ANNUAL IEEE CONFERENCE ON 6-8 NOV.2002, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20021106), doi:10.1109/LCN.2002.1181792, ISBN 978-0-7695-1591-5, pages 261 - 269, XP010628175 [X] 1,7 * page 265, paragraph 2.3 - page 266; figure 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LCN.2002.1181792 | International search | [XA]CN103684739 (BEIJING HIRAIN TECHNOLOGIES CO) [X] 1-3, 6-8, 11 * , description, pages 4-6, and figure 1, description, pages 4-6, and figure 1 * [A] 4-5, 9-10; | [X]CN103532970 (HANGZHOU H3C TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-3, 6-8, 11 * , description, pages 3-8 *; | [X]CN101447861 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [X] 1-3, 6-8, 11 * , description, pages 7-10 *; | [A]CN101459502 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-11 * , the whole document * | Examination | CN201417416Y | CN101789627 |