EP3123786 - CHANNEL SCAN BASED ON MOBILITY STATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | [2021/19] |
Former [2017/05] | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEN, Souvik 1501 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, California 94304-1100 / US | 02 /
GUPTA, Anil 153 Taylor Street Littleton, Massachusetts 01460-1407 / US | 03 /
ARNDT, Manfred R 8000 Foothills Boulevard Roseville, California 95747 / US | 04 /
LEE, Jung Gun (Jeongkeun) 1501 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, California 94304-1100 / US | [2017/05] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/19] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2017/05] | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14896323.4 | 30.06.2014 | [2017/05] | WO2014US44916 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016003424 | Date: | 07.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3123786 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3123786 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/16, H04W64/00 | [2017/49] | CPC: |
H04W48/16 (EP,US);
H04L43/16 (US);
H04W4/027 (EP,US);
H04W48/20 (US);
H04W64/006 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/05] | H04W48/16, H04W48/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KANALABTASTUNG BASIEREND AUF MOBILITÄTSZUSTAND | [2017/05] | English: | CHANNEL SCAN BASED ON MOBILITY STATE | [2017/05] | French: | BALAYAGE DE CANAL EFFECTUÉ SUR LA BASE D'UN ÉTAT DE MOBILITÉ | [2017/05] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/05] | 28.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2014 | AL | 12.05.2021 | AT | 12.05.2021 | CY | 12.05.2021 | CZ | 12.05.2021 | DK | 12.05.2021 | EE | 12.05.2021 | ES | 12.05.2021 | FI | 12.05.2021 | HR | 12.05.2021 | IT | 12.05.2021 | LT | 12.05.2021 | LV | 12.05.2021 | MC | 12.05.2021 | MK | 12.05.2021 | MT | 12.05.2021 | NL | 12.05.2021 | PL | 12.05.2021 | RO | 12.05.2021 | RS | 12.05.2021 | SE | 12.05.2021 | SI | 12.05.2021 | SK | 12.05.2021 | SM | 12.05.2021 | BE | 30.06.2021 | CH | 30.06.2021 | IE | 30.06.2021 | LI | 30.06.2021 | LU | 30.06.2021 | FR | 12.07.2021 | BG | 12.08.2021 | NO | 12.08.2021 | GR | 13.08.2021 | IS | 12.09.2021 | PT | 13.09.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 30.06.2014 | |
AL | 12.05.2021 | ||
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CY | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
IT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
MK | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
IE | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
LU | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 12.07.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 30.06.2014 | |
AL | 12.05.2021 | ||
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CY | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
IT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
IE | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
LU | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 12.07.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 30.06.2014 | |
AL | 12.05.2021 | ||
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
IT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
IE | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
LU | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 12.07.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 12.05.2021 | |
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
IT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
IE | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
LU | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 12.07.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 12.05.2021 | |
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
IE | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
LU | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 12.07.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 12.05.2021 | |
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
IE | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
LU | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 12.07.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 12.05.2021 | |
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
IE | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
LU | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 12.07.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
IE | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
LU | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 12.07.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
IE | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
LU | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
LU | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2009103503 (CHHABRA KAPIL [US]) [Y] 1-5,8-19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0008] - [00 9] - [0011] * * paragraphs [0027] , [0030] - [0046] * * paragraphs [0054] - [0057] * * claims 24-39 * * figures 3,4,5 *; | [Y]US2009270042 (MISCOPEIN BENOIT [FR], et al) [Y] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0008] - [0018] - [0026] * * paragraphs [0042] - [0063] * * figure 2 *; | [Y]WO2013045758 (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [Y] 1,6,7,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0024] - [0034] * * paragraphs [0035] , [0040] - [0043] - [0046] , [0049] * * figures 2A, 2B,3,5 *; | [A]US2014079043 (MONTEMURRO MICHAEL PETER [CA], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0010] , [0 45] - [0051] * * paragraphs [0057] - [0059] - [0035] - [0064] * * paragraphs [0069] - [0070] * * figures 1, 1b, 3 *; | [A] - Tianxing Li ET AL, "Cutting Wi-Fi scan tax for smart devices", ISBN 978-1-321-25474-7, (20140603), URL: http://www.cs.dartmouth.edu/reports/TR2014-752.pdf, (20170811), XP055398371 [A] 1-19 * Page 8 * * Pages 19-20, steps #1 and #2 * * Pages 21-22, section 3.3 * * Page 29 * * Page 40, last non-truncated paragraph. * | [A] - CIURANA M ET AL, "A robust to multi-path ranging technique over IEEE 802.11 networks", WIRELESS NETWORKS ; THE JOURNAL OF MOBILE COMMUNICATION, COMPUTATION AND INFORMATION, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DO, (20090429), vol. 16, no. 4, ISSN 1572-8196, pages 943 - 953, XP019832834 [A] 1-19 * abstract * * Page 2 * * figure 1 * | [T] - LI SUN ET AL, "Bringing Mobility-Awareness to WLANs using PHY Layer Information", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 10TH ACM INTERNATIONAL ON CONFERENCE ON EMERGING NETWORKING EXPERIMENTS AND TECHNOLOGIES, CONEXT '14, New York, New York, USA, (20141205), doi:10.1145/2674005.2675017, ISBN 978-1-4503-3279-8, pages 53 - 66, XP055398374 [T] 1-19 * abstract * * Section 2.4 * * Sections 3, 3.1, 4 * * Section 9, "Roaming for real time traffic" paragraph. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2674005.2675017 | International search | [YA]US2011013600 (KIM JUHEE [KR], et al) [Y] 1, 12, 19 * See figure 4 and paragraphs [0039]-[0041]. * [A] 2-11, 13-18; | [A]US2012014425 (ZHUANG JIANDONG [CA], et al) [A] 1-19 * See figure 3 and corresponding detailed description. *; | [A]US2012124088 (MESHKATI FARHAD [US], et al) [A] 1-19* See figures 6-9 and corresponding detailed description. *; | [YA]US2013244664 (SONG YI [US], et al) [Y] 1, 12, 19 * See abstract, figures 5-9 and claims 1-68. * [A] 2-11, 13-18 | Examination | US2011151842 | US2013191019 |