EP3165916 - PREPROCESSING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shimadzu Corporation 1, Nishinokyo-Kuwabaracho Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 604-8511 / JP | [2017/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANAFUSA Nobuhiro c/o SHIMADZU CORPORATION 1 Nishinokyo-kuwabaracho Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 604-8511 / JP | 02 /
SHIKATA Masamitsu c/o SHIMADZU CORPORATION 1 Nishinokyo-kuwabaracho Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 604-8511 / JP | [2017/19] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2017/19] | Application number, filing date | 14896680.7 | 02.07.2014 | [2017/19] | WO2014JP67709 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016002032 | Date: | 07.01.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3165916 | Date: | 10.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3165916 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/34, G01N1/40, G01N35/02, B01L3/00, // G01N35/00, G01N35/04 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
G01N1/34 (EP,US);
G01N1/10 (US);
B01L3/502 (EP,US);
G01N1/14 (US);
G01N1/4005 (EP,US);
G01N30/06 (EP,US);
G01N35/0099 (EP,US);
G01N35/025 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0631 (EP,US);
G01N2001/4011 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00485 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00534 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/19] | G01N30/06, G01N1/10, G01N1/34, G01N1/38, G01N35/02, G01N35/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/19] | English: | PREPROCESSING APPARATUS | [2017/19] | French: | APPAREIL DE PRÉTRAITEMENT | [2017/19] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2016 | Translation filed | 29.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 29.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/19] | 27.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.08.2023 | CZ | 23.08.2023 | DK | 23.08.2023 | EE | 23.08.2023 | ES | 23.08.2023 | FI | 23.08.2023 | HR | 23.08.2023 | IT | 23.08.2023 | LT | 23.08.2023 | LV | 23.08.2023 | NL | 23.08.2023 | PL | 23.08.2023 | RO | 23.08.2023 | RS | 23.08.2023 | SE | 23.08.2023 | SI | 23.08.2023 | SK | 23.08.2023 | SM | 23.08.2023 | NO | 23.11.2023 | GR | 24.11.2023 | IS | 23.12.2023 | PT | 26.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
IT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 23.08.2023 | |
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2003339374 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0025] * * figures 1-4, 7 * [I] 10-14; | [A]US2004120860 (INGENHOVEN NIKOLAUS [CH]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [XAI]US2009035866 (WILSON BRIAN D [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0059] * * figure 1 * [A] 2-9 [I] 10-14; | [A]WO2009072400 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [A]US2011104026 (YOON SEONGJUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [XAI]EP2348322 (SYSMEX CORP [JP]) [X] 1,10,12,14 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0112] * * figures 4, 11, 12, 15-20 * [A] 2-9 [I] 11,13 | International search | [A]JPH0499477 (TOSOH CORP) [A] 2-13 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH04164257 (AJINOMOTO KK) [A] 2-13 * , entire text; all drawings & US 5305650 A *; | [A]JP2007033414 (OLYMPUS CORP) [A] 6 * , paragraphs [0006], [0036], [0049]; fig. 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2010060474 (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP) [A] 2-13 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2011/0157580 A1 & WO 2010/026837 A1 *; | [A]WO2010087387 (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP [JP], et al) [A] 2-13 * , paragraphs [0018], [0084] to [0103]; fig. 1, 11, 12 & US 2011/0291004 A1 & DE 112010000843 T5 & CN 102301218 A *; | [A]WO2011019032 (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP [JP], et al) [A] 2-13 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2012/0134895 A1 & EP 2466289 A1 & CN 102472692 A *; | [XA]JP2012100549 (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP) [X] 1, 14 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2013/0230908 A1 & EP 2639587 A1 & WO 2012/063647 A1 & CN 103201633 A * [A] 2-13; | [A]JP2013003003 (NISSIN FOODS HOLDINGS CO LTD, et al) [A] 2-13 * , paragraphs [0097], [0098], [0105]; fig. 19 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP3188929U (Shimadzu Corp.) [A] 14* , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) * |