EP3145156 - USER DATA PROCESSING METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2017/12] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAN, Yuanli Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Hongjun Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
SHAN, Zhenwei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
LIU, Bing Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2017/12] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/12] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 12 10719 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 14896735.9 | 30.06.2014 | [2017/12] | WO2014CN81247 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016000163 | Date: | 07.01.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3145156 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, H04W4/00 | [2017/22] | CPC: |
H04W4/70 (EP,US);
G06T11/206 (US);
A61B5/021 (US);
A61B5/4806 (US);
A61B5/6803 (US);
A61B5/681 (US);
G06F3/14 (US);
H04L65/40 (US);
A61B5/024 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/12] | H04L29/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BENUTZERDATENVERARBEITUNG | [2017/12] | English: | USER DATA PROCESSING METHOD AND DEVICE | [2017/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DES DONNÉES D'UTILISATEUR | [2017/12] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2016 | Translation filed | 12.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 12.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/12] | 12.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/30] | 19.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2013118144 (TATA CONSULTANCY SERVICES LTD [IN]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 4, line 3 * * page 5, line 9 - page 6, line 14 ** page 8, line 8 - page 10, line l *; | [X]US2013297547 (DING LI [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0026] - [0 38] - [0047] - [0 50] - [0063] * * figures 1,2 * * claims 1-3 * | International search | [A]US2007049814 (MUCCIO PHILIP E [US]) [A] 1-8* , the whole document *; | [A]CN202282004U (SHANGHAI JULANG INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN103198615 (CHANGE CORP) [A] 1-8 * , the whole document *; | [XA]CN103810254 (UNIV ZHEJIANG) [X] 1, 5 * , description, paragraphs [0004]-[0009] and [0064]-[0084], and figure 1, description, paragraphs [0004]-[0009] and [0064]-[0084], and figure 1 * [A] 2-4, 6-8 |