EP3167214 - CURVED SHUNT FOR SOLENOID CURVE SHAPING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Borgwarner Inc. 3850 Hamlin Road Auburn Hills, Michigan 48326 / US | [2017/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELAND, Daniel L. 12423 E. Potter Road Davison, MI 48423 / US | [2017/20] | Representative(s) | Leckel, Ulf Leckel-Patentanwaltskanzlei Speyerer Straße 6 67227 Frankenthal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/20] | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstraße 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 14897250.8 | 10.07.2014 | [2017/20] | WO2014US46087 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016007159 | Date: | 14.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3167214 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/06, H01F7/16, F16K27/02, H01F7/08 | [2018/16] | CPC: |
F16K31/0675 (EP,KR,US);
F16K27/029 (EP,US);
F16K27/048 (KR);
H01F7/081 (EP,US);
H01F7/16 (KR);
H01F7/1607 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/20] | F16K31/06, H01F7/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/20] | Title | German: | GEKRÜMMTER SHUNT ZUR MAGNETKURVENKRÜMMUNG | [2017/20] | English: | CURVED SHUNT FOR SOLENOID CURVE SHAPING | [2017/20] | French: | SHUNT INCURVÉ POUR MISE EN FORME DE COURBE DE SOLÉNOÏDE | [2017/20] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/20] | 26.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1055812 (SIEMENS AUTOMOTIVE CORP LP [US]) [X] 1,3,5,7,8 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0020] * [I] 4,13; | [X]US2002060620 (BIRCANN RAUL A [US], et al) [X] 8,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] * | International search | [Y]WO2013116031 (BORGWARNER INC [US]) [Y] 1, 8, 15 * See paragraphs [0013]-[0022] and figures 1-4. *; | [Y]US2011168932 (STRAUSS KLEMENS [DE], et al) [Y] 1, 8, 15 * See paragraphs [0025]-[0026], claims 16, 21, and figures 1-2. *; | [A]US2009121817 (ISHIBASHI RYO [JP]) [A] 1, 8, 15 * See paragraphs [0043]-[0055] and figures 1A-2E. *; | [A]JP2013168425 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1, 8, 15 * See paragraphs [0016]-[0017] and figures 1(a)-1(b). *; | [A]US2011115587 (ISHIBASHI RYO [JP]) [A] 1, 8, 15 * See paragraphs [0034]-[0039] and figures 1A-8. * |