EP3170099 - MANAGING DATA INGESTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2017/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Zhen Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 02 /
MAK, Chiu Chun Bobby c/o Microsoft Asia Pacific R&D Headquarters 14F Building 2 No. 5 Dan Ling Street, Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | 03 /
HUYNH, Yet Luong c/o Microsoft Asia Pacific R&D Headquarters 14F Building 2 No. 5 Dan Ling Street, Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | 04 /
ZHOU, Chunxing c/o Microsoft Asia Pacific R&D Headquarters 14F Building 2 No. 5 Dan Ling Street, Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | 05 /
ZHAO, Li c/o Microsoft Asia Pacific R&D Headquarters 14F Building 2 No. 5 Dan Ling Street, Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | 06 /
HAN, ZhiPeng c/o Microsoft Asia Pacific R&D Headquarters 14F Building 2 No. 5 Dan Ling Street, Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | 07 /
SUN, Gary Chia Chi Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 08 /
WANG, DaFeng c/o Microsoft Asia Pacific R&D Headquarters 14F Building 2 No. 5 Dan Ling Street, Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | [2017/21] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/21] | Application number, filing date | 14897491.8 | 15.07.2014 | [2017/21] | WO2014CN82215 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016008090 | Date: | 21.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3170099 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.01.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2017/21] | CPC: |
G06F16/254 (EP,US);
G06F16/258 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/21] | Title | German: | VERWALTUNG VON DATENAUFNAHME | [2017/21] | English: | MANAGING DATA INGESTION | [2017/21] | French: | GESTION DE L'INGESTION DE DONNÉES | [2017/21] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/21] | 23.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.04.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2007005730 (CLARABRIDGE INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * page 3, line 17 - line 20; figure 3 * * page 11, line 13 - line 15 * * page 9, line 21 - line 23 *; | [I]US2004249644 (SCHIEFER JOSEF [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0013] - [0149]; figures 2,3 *; | [I]US2010114895 (BHAGWAN VARUN [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0005] - [0013] - [0025] - [0031]; figure 1 *; | [E]US2015347486 (JULIA LUC [US], et al) [E] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2013325881 (DESHPANDE PRASAD M [IN], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]CN102360370 (MAIPU COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 1-15 * description, paragraphs [0003]-[0007] *; | [Y]US5010478 (DERAN ROGER L [US]) [Y] 1-15 * description, column 3 lines 1-10, and column 12 lines 30-40 *; | [A]CN101980213 (INST OF SOFTWARE OF CHINESE ACADEMY OF SCIENCES ISCAS) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US7912869 (JAS FRANK [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |