03.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
30.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
16.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
26.07.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] |
19.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
12.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] |
21.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] |
31.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
10.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
03.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] |
26.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
19.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
22.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
08.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
01.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
25.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
18.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
11.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
17.08.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |
14.08.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
13.08.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
13.08.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
19.05.2018 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
05.05.2018 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.05.2018 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
09.04.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.01.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.10.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.10.2017 |
Change - extension states |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
15.06.2017 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 12.07.2017 [2017/28] |
09.06.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.07.2017 [2017/28] |
12.04.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
07.12.2016 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
07.12.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.12.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.01.2017 [2017/01] |
02.12.2016 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
02.12.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.01.2017 [2017/01] |
30.11.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.10.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.10.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.09.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
28.09.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.02.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.02.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|