EP3178009 - REPLICATING A WEB TECHNOLOGY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2018 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EntIT Software LLC 1140 Enterprise Way, Building G Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | [2017/47] |
Former [2017/24] | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEVI, Elad Shabazi 19 56100 Yehud / IL | 02 /
MIZRAHI, Avigad Shabazi 19 56100 Yehud / IL | 03 /
BAR ZIK, Ran Altalef St. No 5 Shabazi St. No 26 56100 Yehud / IL | [2017/24] | Representative(s) | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/24] | Holt, Daniel Richard Hewlett Packard Servicios Espana S.L. Vicente Aloixandre 1 Parque Empresarial la Rozas 38232 La Rozas, Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 14899278.7 | 08.08.2014 | [2017/24] | WO2014US50258 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016022137 | Date: | 11.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3178009 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.02.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16, G06F17/00, // G06F9/54, G06F11/34, G06N5/02 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
G06F9/54 (EP,US);
G06F8/36 (US);
G06F9/546 (US);
H04L67/01 (US);
H04L67/1095 (US);
H04L67/34 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/24] | G06F15/16, G06F17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/24] | Title | German: | REPLIKATION EINER WEB-TECHNOLOGIE | [2017/24] | English: | REPLICATING A WEB TECHNOLOGY | [2017/24] | French: | RÉPLICATION D'UNE TECHNOLOGIE WEB | [2017/24] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2017 | Search fee paid | 03.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/24] | 03.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003101152 (HICKS RICHARD C [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0023] , [0032] , [0034] , [0049] - [0052] - [0070] - [0075] ** claims 1,2 *; | [I]EP2302509 (CITRIX SYSTEMS INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0074] , [0075] , [0080] , [0083] , [0085] , [0095] , [0097] , [0098] , [0106] , [0119] - [0125] *; | [I]US2011302454 (PROPHETE DIDIER [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0021] , [0022] , [0027] , [0055] , [0056] , [0059] , [0061] , [0074] , [0076] *; | [A]US8266202 (COLTON PAUL [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 5, line 12 - line 67 * * column 9, line 16 - line 58 * * column 11, line 1 - line 9 * * column 14, line 14 - line 67 * * column 15, line 1 - line 21 * * claim 1 *; | [I]US8463874 (NAKAMURA TOMOHIRO [JP]) [I] 1-15 * column 3, line 13 - line 67 * * column 5, line 16 - line 54 * * column 6, line 11 - line 64 * * column 7, line 4 - line 37 * * column 10, line 23 - line 53 * * column 13, line 49 - line 67 * * column 14, line 1 - line 11 * * column 14, line 28 - line 64 * * column 15, line 24 - line 42 * | International search | [A]US2008071929 (MOTTE YANN EMMANUEL [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * See abstract; paragraphs [129]-[130]; figures 2-4, 8-9. *; | [A]US7698256 (WANG ZHAO Y [US]) [A] 1-15 * See abstract; column 6 line 35 - column 7 line 10; figure 1C. *; | [A]US2011131273 (MERISSERT-COFFINIERES PATRICK [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * See abstract; claims 1,5,7; figures 1-3. *; | [A]US8375305 (STRAND WILLIAM ALEXANDER [US]) [A] 1-15 * See abstract; figure 6. *; | [A]US2013332732 (KUNIN JAY S [US], et al) [A] 1-15* See abstract; claim 1; figure 1. * |