EP3192012 - LEARNING STUDENT DNN VIA OUTPUT DISTRIBUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.12.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2017/45] |
Former [2017/29] | For all designated states Microsoft Corp. One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Rui c/o Microsoft Asia Pacific R&D Headquarters 14F Building 2 No. 5 Danling Street, Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | 02 /
HUANG, Jui-Ting c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 03 /
LI, Jinyu c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 04 /
GONG, Yifan c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | [2017/29] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/29] | Holtby, Christopher Lawrence, et al Olswang Germany LLP Rosental 4 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14901677.6 | 12.09.2014 | [2017/29] | WO2014CN86397 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016037350 | Date: | 17.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3192012 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 17.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/04, G06N3/08, G06N7/00 | [2018/03] | CPC: |
G06N3/084 (EP,RU,US);
G06N20/00 (RU,US);
G06N3/045 (EP,RU,US);
G06N3/082 (US);
G06N7/01 (EP,RU,US);
G09B5/00 (EP,RU,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/29] | G06K9/66 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/29] | Title | German: | LERNENDES STUDENTEN-DNN ÜBER AUSGABEVERTEILUNG | [2017/29] | English: | LEARNING STUDENT DNN VIA OUTPUT DISTRIBUTION | [2017/29] | French: | APPRENTISSAGE DE DNN ÉLÈVE PAR LE BIAIS D'UNE DISTRIBUTION DE SORTIE | [2017/29] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2017 | Search fee paid | 13.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/29] | 13.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.09.2020 | 09.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/04] | 09.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.09.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US7835910 (HAKKANI-TUR DILEK Z [US], et al); | [A]WO2014114116 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD [CN]) | International search | [A]CN103400577 (BEIJING BAIDU NETCOM SCI & TEC); | [A]CN103456299 (BEIJING BAIDU NETCOM SCI & TEC); | [A]CN103544705 (UNIV SOUTH CHINA TECH); | [A]US2014201126 (ZADEH LOTFI A [US], et al); | [A]CN103955702 (UNIV XIDIAN); | [A]TW201430830 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD [CN]) |