EP3195358 - DIE WITH INTEGRATED MICROPHONE DEVICE USING THROUGH-SILICON VIAS (TSVs) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2017/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Kevin J. 8767 SW Amicus Terrace Beaverton 97007 / US | 02 /
SARASWAT, Ruchir 8767 SW Amicus Terrace Beaverton 97007 / US | 03 /
ZILLMANN, Uwe Fallstein Strasse 2 38124 Braunschweig / DE | 04 /
RAO, Valluri Bob 15115 El Quito Way Saratoga, California 95070 / US | 05 /
LUND-LARSEN, Tor Herder Strasse 5 38102 Braunschweig / DE | 06 /
COWLEY, Nicholas P. 3 Priors Hill Wroughton WIL SN4 0RT / GB | [2017/30] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2017/30] | Application number, filing date | 14901871.5 | 17.09.2014 | [2017/30] | WO2014US56133 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016043738 | Date: | 24.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3195358 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/04, H01L21/60, B81B7/02 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
H01L21/6835 (EP,KR,US);
H01L24/32 (EP,KR,US);
H04R1/04 (US);
B81B7/02 (KR,US);
B81C1/00158 (US);
H01L21/6836 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/76898 (US);
H01L23/481 (EP,KR,US);
H01L24/13 (EP,KR,US);
H01L24/16 (EP,KR,US);
H01L24/27 (EP,KR,US);
H01L24/29 (EP,KR,US);
H01L24/83 (EP,KR,US);
H04R1/406 (US);
H04R19/005 (US);
H04R19/04 (EP,US);
B81B2201/0257 (US);
B81B2207/096 (US);
B81C2201/0132 (US);
B81C2203/0109 (US);
H01L2221/68327 (EP,US);
H01L2221/6834 (EP,US);
H01L2221/68381 (EP,US);
H01L2224/131 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/27002 (EP,US);
H01L2224/27618 (EP,US);
H01L2224/27848 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29011 (EP,US);
H01L2224/2919 (EP,US);
H01L2224/3201 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32058 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32245 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73204 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83005 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83193 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83438 (EP,US);
H01L2224/8346 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83488 (EP,US);
H01L2224/8359 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83688 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83862 (EP,US);
H01L2224/92 (EP,US);
H01L2224/9222 (EP,US);
H01L2224/92225 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1461 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15311 (EP,US);
H01L2924/161 (EP,US);
H01L2924/16151 (EP,US);
H01L2924/16152 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/131, H01L2924/014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/27848, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP);
H01L2224/2919, H01L2924/0665 (US,EP);
H01L2224/3201, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73204, H01L2224/16225, H01L2224/32225, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/83438, H01L2924/01014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/83488, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/8359, H01L2924/0665 (US,EP);
H01L2224/83688, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/83862, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/9222, H01L2224/11, H01L2224/27, H01L2224/83, H01L2224/81 (EP,US);
H01L2224/92, H01L2221/68304, H01L2224/27002, H01L2224/83005, H01L2221/68381 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/30] | Title | German: | MATRIZE MIT INTEGRIERTER MIKROFONVORRICHTUNG MIT VERWENDUNG VON SILICIUMDURCHKONTAKTIERUNGEN (TSVS) | [2017/30] | English: | DIE WITH INTEGRATED MICROPHONE DEVICE USING THROUGH-SILICON VIAS (TSVs) | [2017/30] | French: | MICROPLAQUETTE À MICROPHONE INTÉGRÉ AU MOYEN D'INTERCONNEXIONS VERTICALES (TSV) | [2017/30] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2017 | Search fee paid | 02.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/30] | 02.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.04.2020 | 29.04.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007158826 (SAKAKIBARA SHINGO [JP], et al) [X] 1-8,10,12-14 * page 4, paragraph 68 - page 18, paragraph 258 * [I] 15; | [X]US6522762 (MULLENBORN MATTHIAS [DK], et al) [X] 1,9,11,12 * the whole document * | International search | [XYA]US2012261775 (WANG CHUAN-WEI [TW], et al) [X] 1, 12 * See abstract, paragraphs [0026]-[0029] and figures 2-4. * [Y] 2, 4-11, 13-21 [A] 3; | [Y]US2013334626 (WEBER HERIBERT [DE]) [Y] 2, 4-9, 13-18 * See abstract, paragraphs [0022]-[0034] and figures 1a-1f. *; | [Y]US2012237073 (GOIDA THOMAS [US], et al) [Y] 10, 19-21 * See abstract, paragraphs [0021]-[0029] and figures 1A-2. *; | [Y]JP2006211468 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [Y] 11 * See abstract, paragraph [0044] and figure 9. *; | [A]US2011241137 (HUANG CHIEN-HSIN [TW], et al) [A] 1-21 * See abstract, paragraphs [0038]-[0046] and figures 2A-3. * |