EP3195565 - TECHNOLOGIES FOR PRE-ACTION EXECUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2017/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENG, Pang No. 880 Zi Xing Road Shanghai Zizhu Science Park Room301 Building128 No1118 Xizha Road Shanghai 200241 / CN | 02 /
DING, Junyong Room 502 No. 59 Lane 88 Pingji Road Shanghai 201102 / CN | 03 /
XU, Shu Intel Asia-Pacific R&D Ltd. No.880 Zixing Road 200241 / CN | [2017/30] | Representative(s) | Rummler, Felix, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/30] | Rummler, Felix, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14902112.3 | 18.09.2014 | [2017/30] | WO2014CN86845 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016041175 | Date: | 24.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3195565 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, H04L29/06 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
H04L67/02 (EP,US);
H04L67/535 (EP,US);
H04L47/808 (US);
H04L47/83 (EP);
H04L67/306 (US);
H04L67/01 (US)
|
Former IPC [2017/30] | H04L29/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/30] | Title | German: | TECHNOLOGIEN ZUR AUSFÜHRUNG VON VORAKTIONEN | [2017/30] | English: | TECHNOLOGIES FOR PRE-ACTION EXECUTION | [2017/30] | French: | TECHNOLOGIES D'EXÉCUTION DE PRÉ-ACTION | [2017/30] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2017 | Search fee paid | 07.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/30] | 07.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/30] | 22.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2021 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003187984 (BANAVAR GURUDUTH SOMASEKHARA [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 2-4,6,9,11,14,15,17,18 ** paragraphs [0012] - [0016] - [0040] - [0042] - [0051] - [0069] - [0093] - [0103] - [0106] , [0107] , [0120] - [0123] - [0126] - [0133] *; | [X]US2006294223 (GLASGOW DANE A [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] - [0007] - [0016] , [0020] , [0022] - [0024] - [0026] - [0048] * * claims 1,5,12 * | International search | [A]US2008183801 (MARTON GABOR [HU], et al) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A]CN102891916 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-25* the whole document *; | [A]CN103019518 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMM) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A]CN103106208 (CHINA MOBILE COMM CORP) [A] 1-25 * the whole document * |