06.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
31.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
29.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
15.09.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.10.2023 [2023/42] |
28.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
19.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] |
28.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
24.03.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.04.2023 [2023/17] |
17.02.2023 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.03.2023 [2023/12] |
03.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
27.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] |
13.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] |
18.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2022 [2022/51] |
11.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2022 [2022/50] |
04.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] |
28.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] |
21.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] |
30.09.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] |
11.03.2022 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.04.2022 [2022/15] |
08.03.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
08.03.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
07.03.2022 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
14.11.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.10.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.10.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.10.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.08.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
09.11.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
25.09.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.04.2018 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
20.04.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
20.04.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
24.11.2017 |
Change - extension states |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
22.09.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.06.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.07.2017 [2017/30] |
23.06.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
23.06.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.07.2017 [2017/30] |
14.04.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.03.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.03.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
21.03.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.03.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.04.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.03.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|