Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016043365 | Global Dossier | 24.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014KR08745 | 19.09.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017276151 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014KR08745 | 19.09.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106715801 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014KR08745 | 19.09.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3196367 | Global Dossier | 13.04.2022 | B1 | EP3196367 | 23.05.2018 | A4 | EP3196367 | 26.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014KR08745 | 19.09.2014 |