EP3190560 - ORDER PROCESSING METHOD AND TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 06.04.2022 [2022/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2017/28] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Guoqing Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
CHANG, Xinmiao Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2017/28] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [2017/28] | Application number, filing date | 14902384.8 | 25.09.2014 | [2017/28] | WO2014CN87464 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016045066 | Date: | 31.03.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3190560 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 31.03.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/06 | [2017/28] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0605 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0633 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0635 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3224 (US);
G06Q30/0205 (US);
G06Q30/0261 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/28] | Title | German: | BESTELLVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND ENDGERÄT | [2017/28] | English: | ORDER PROCESSING METHOD AND TERMINAL | [2017/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET TERMINAL DE TRAITEMENT DE COMMANDES | [2017/28] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2017 | Translation filed | 03.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2017 | Search fee paid | 03.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/28] | 03.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/14] | 15.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.11.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US2013166360 (KSHETRAMADE SANJAY [US], et al) [A] 1-33* the whole document *; | [A]CN103839144 (NIUHAI INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY SHANGHAI CO LTD) [A] 1-33 * the whole document *; | [X]CN103870987 (SHANGHAI YUNXIANG SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1, 2, 4-6, 9-13, 15-17, 20-24, 26-28, 31-33 * see description, paragraphs [0024]-[0038], [0047]-[0066] and figures 1-4 * |