EP3203468 - ACOUSTIC SYSTEM, COMMUNICATION DEVICE, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COTODAMA Inc. 6-3-16 Minamiaoyama Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0062 / JP | [2019/33] |
Former [2018/40] | For all designated states COTODAMA Inc. 5-11-10 Minamiaoyama Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0062 / JP | ||
Former [2017/32] | For all designated states Lyric Arts Inc. 5-11-10 Minamiaoyama Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0062 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAITO, Jin c/o Lyric Arts Inc. 5-11-10 Minamiaoyama Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0062 / JP | [2017/32] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2023/39] |
Former [2017/32] | Johnson, Yvonne Catherine Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14903120.5 | 30.09.2014 | [2017/32] | WO2014JP76181 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016051534 | Date: | 07.04.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3203468 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3203468 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G10K15/04, G10H1/00, H04M1/725, H04N21/233, G10H1/36, G06F3/16 | [2018/17] | CPC: |
G06F3/165 (EP,US);
G10H1/365 (EP,US);
G10H1/00 (US);
G10H1/0008 (EP);
G10K15/04 (US);
H04M1/72442 (US);
H04N21/233 (US);
G10H2220/011 (EP);
G10H2240/211 (US);
G10H2240/325 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/32] | G10K15/04, G10H1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AKUSTISCHES SYSTEM, KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND PROGRAMM | [2017/32] | English: | ACOUSTIC SYSTEM, COMMUNICATION DEVICE, AND PROGRAM | [2017/32] | French: | SYSTÈME ACOUSTIQUE, DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION ET PROGRAMME | [2017/32] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2017 | Translation filed | 01.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 01.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 01.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/32] | 24.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.09.2023 | CZ | 27.09.2023 | DK | 27.09.2023 | EE | 27.09.2023 | ES | 27.09.2023 | FI | 27.09.2023 | IT | 27.09.2023 | LT | 27.09.2023 | LV | 27.09.2023 | MC | 27.09.2023 | NL | 27.09.2023 | PL | 27.09.2023 | RO | 27.09.2023 | RS | 27.09.2023 | SE | 27.09.2023 | SK | 27.09.2023 | SM | 27.09.2023 | BE | 30.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | IE | 30.09.2023 | LU | 30.09.2023 | NO | 27.12.2023 | GR | 28.12.2023 | IS | 27.01.2024 | PT | 29.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
DK | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
IT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
MC | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
CH | 30.09.2023 | ||
IE | 30.09.2023 | ||
LU | 30.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
DK | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
IT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
MC | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
IE | 30.09.2023 | ||
LU | 30.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
IT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
MC | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
LU | 30.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
IT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
LU | 30.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
LU | 30.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 27.09.2023 | |
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2008056273 (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1 - page 7 * * claims 1-24 *; | [XA]EP2251871 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0167] - paragraph [0195] * [A] 11-15; | [XA] - Kevin Purdy, "TuneWiki Puts Lyrics, Radio, and Social Features into Mobile Music", Lifehacker, (20090714), URL: http://lifehacker.com/5314147/tunewiki-puts-lyrics-radio-and-social-features-into-mobile-music, (20150819), XP055208478 [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1 - page 2 * [A] 11-15 | International search | [A]JP2004177586 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [X]JP2006106286 (XING INC) [X] 1, 6, 8-10 * , paragraphs [0018], [0022] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2006106039 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-15 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [XY]JP2008197501 (YAMAHA CORP) [X] 1, 4-10, 12, 13 * , paragraphs [0010], [0013], [0029] (Family: none) * [Y] 2, 3, 11, 14, 15; | [Y]JP2010286812 (FUJITSU LTD) [Y] 2, 3, 11, 14, 15 * , paragraphs [0052] to [0056]; fig. 6 & US 2010/0293464 A1 & EP 2251871 A1 *; | [A]JP2011158669 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-15* , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2013068900 (YAMAHA CORP) [Y] 2, 3, 11, 14, 15 * , paragraph [0004] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2013160890 (BROTHER IND LTD) [A] 1-15 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) * | Examination | US2004266337 |