EP3203781 - NETWORK SELECTION METHOD AND APPARATUS BASED ON COMMUNICATIONS TERMINAL, AND TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yulong Computer Telecommunication Scientific (Shenzhen) Co. Ltd. No. 2 Mengxi Road North of High-Tech Garden Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2017/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIN, Zhenfa No. 2 Mengxi Road North of High-tech Garden Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2017/32] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/32] | Cordina, Kevin John CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | Application number, filing date | 14903346.6 | 29.11.2014 | [2017/32] | WO2014CN92611 | Priority number, date | CN201410524886 | 30.09.2014 Original published format: CN201410524886 | [2017/32] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016049977 | Date: | 07.04.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3203781 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/18, // H04W88/06 | [2018/14] | CPC: |
H04W48/18 (EP,CN,US);
H04L12/5692 (EP,US);
H04W28/0268 (US);
H04W84/12 (US);
H04W88/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/32] | H04W48/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] | Title | German: | NETZWERKAUSWAHLVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG BASIEREND AUF EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄT UND ENDGERÄT | [2017/32] | English: | NETWORK SELECTION METHOD AND APPARATUS BASED ON COMMUNICATIONS TERMINAL, AND TERMINAL | [2017/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SÉLECTION DE RÉSEAU ET APPAREIL BASÉ SUR UN TERMINAL DE COMMUNICATION ET TERMINAL | [2017/32] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2017 | Translation filed | 18.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/32] | 18.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/13] | 08.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006146825 (HOFSTAEDTER CHRISTIAN [US], et al) [Y] 3-5,11-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0023] - [0025] - [0059] - [0091] * * paragraphs [0110] - [0126] * * figures 6-12 *; | [XYI]US2010091653 (KOODLI RAJEEV [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0006] - [0017] - [0020] * * paragraphs [0042] , [0 48] * * claims 1-2 * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 3-5,11-13 [I] 2,6-8,10,14,15; | [A]US2011151924 (MILLER ROSEMARIE B [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] , [0073] - [0103] * * paragraphs [0157] - [0163] - [ 188] - [0190] ** figures 1,4-5 *; | [X]EP2445266 (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0009] - [0 14] , [0026] - [0031] * * paragraphs [0035] - [0044] - [0053] * * figures 1,3 *; | [A]US2013265879 (QIANG ZU [CA]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0008] - [0 16] - [0024] * * paragraphs [0028] , [0036] * * figure 1 * | International search | [XY]CN102209358 (SHANGHAI DINGZU COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1, 6, 10 * description, paragraphs [0028]-[0045] description, paragraphs [0028]-[0045] * [Y] 4, 5, 9; | [Y]CN102761859 (HUIZHOU TCL MOBILE COMM CO LTD) [Y] 4, 5, 9 * claim 7 *; | [A]CN103096385 (BEIJING XIAOMI TECHNOLOGY CO) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |