EP3204308 - SECURITY LID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mizioch, Gregory, J. 6811 E. Montgomery Road Scottsdale, AZ 85262 / US | [2017/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERLESE, Robert, C. 8501 E. De La O Road Scottdale, AZ 85255 / US | 02 /
MIZIOCH, Gregory, J. 6811 E. Montgomery Road Scottsdale, AZ 85262 / US | [2017/33] | Representative(s) | Schiener, Jens Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstraße 8 80333 München / DE | [2017/33] | Application number, filing date | 14903509.9 | 09.10.2014 | [2017/33] | WO2014US59892 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016057039 | Date: | 14.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3204308 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B65D55/14, E02D29/14 | [2018/24] | CPC: |
B65D55/14 (EP);
E02D29/1481 (EP);
F17D1/00 (EP);
F17D1/04 (EP);
F17D3/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2017/33] | B65D55/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/33] | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSDECKEL | [2017/33] | English: | SECURITY LID | [2017/33] | French: | COUVERCLE DE SÉCURITÉ | [2017/33] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/33] | 30.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 26.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4921123 (MIZIOCH GREGORY J [US]) [A] 1-11 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 38; figures 4,3 *; | [A]US5148938 (MORGAN JR HOWARD W [US]) [A] 1-11 * column 2, line 19 - column 5, line 51; figures 1,4 *; | [A]US5778934 (CAMPBELL LUCKY [US]) [A] 1-11 * column 2, line 11 - column 4, line 12; figures 5,7 *; | [A]US6073792 (CAMPBELL LUCKY [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2008256997 (NOLLE ERIC R [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0055]; figures 4,7,16 *; | [A]US2013212945 (LANHAM THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1-11* paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0087]; figures 1-4 * | International search | [Y]US4921123 (MIZIOCH GREGORY J [US]) [Y] 1-11 * entire document *; | [Y]US5148938 (MORGAN JR HOWARD W [US]) [Y] 3-5, 9-11 * entire document *; | [Y]US5778934 (CAMPBELL LUCKY [US]) [Y] 1-11 * entire document *; | [Y]US6073792 (CAMPBELL LUCKY [US], et al) [Y] 6-11* entire document * |