EP3214577 - IMAGE TEXT RECOGNITION METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.2022 [2022/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen TCL Digital Technology Ltd. Room B815 Shenzhen R&D Building of Wuhan University No. 6 of Yuexing No. 2 Road, Nanshan District Shenzhen City, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2017/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Jie 7/F., D4, TCL S&T Building TCL International E City No. 1001 Zhongshan Park Road Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518052 / CN | 02 /
YAN, Yegang 7/F., D4, TCL S&T Building TCL International E City No. 1001 Zhongshan Park Road Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518052 / CN | [2017/36] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Davide Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2017/36] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 14904976.9 | 13.12.2014 | [2017/36] | WO2014CN93767 | Priority number, date | CN201410581671 | 27.10.2014 Original published format: CN201410581671 | [2017/36] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016065701 | Date: | 06.05.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3214577 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.05.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/20, G06K9/32, G06K9/34, G06K9/38, G06K9/68 | [2018/23] | CPC: |
G06V20/63 (EP,US);
G06V30/158 (EP,US);
G06V30/162 (EP,US);
G06V30/10 (EP,US);
G06V30/18095 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/36] | G06K9/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BILDTEXTERKENNUNG | [2017/36] | English: | IMAGE TEXT RECOGNITION METHOD AND DEVICE | [2017/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE RECONNAISSANCE DE TEXTE D'IMAGE | [2017/36] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2016 | Translation filed | 15.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/36] | 15.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/42] | 15.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5999647 (NAKAO ICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 25, line 45 - column 26, line 37 * * column 31, line 61 - column 32, line 45 * * claim 1 * * figures 40,41 *; | [XI]US2011255795 (NAKAMURA HIROSHI [JP]) [X] 1,2,7,8 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0090] * * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0112] * * figures 1,3,5,6,7 * [I] 3-6,9-12; | [XI]EP2657902 (UNIV PEKING FOUNDER GROUP CO [CN], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0076] * * figures 4A,7A * [I] 6,12; | [A]US2014185933 (TIAN YIBIN [US], et al) [A] 1,2,5-8,11,12 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0023] ** figure 1 * | International search | [X]CN103413271 (UNIV XI AN JIAOTONG) [X] 1-2, 5-12, 15-20 * , description, paragraphs 30-45, and figures 1-4 *; | [A]CN103455814 (CANON KK) [A] 1-20* , the whole document * |