EP3221579 - WIND TURBINE CONDITION MONITORING METHOD AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Energy Ltd Brown-Boveri-Strasse 5 8050 Zürich / CH | [2023/50] |
Former [2022/03] | For all designated states Hitachi Energy Switzerland AG Bruggerstrasse 72 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2020/30] | For all designated states ABB Power Grids Switzerland AG Bruggerstrasse 72 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2017/39] | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Rongrong Room 1206 No. 8 Ganluqingyuan Chaoyang District Beijing 100123 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Niya Room 906 No. 3 Fangushuijun No. 2 Tuofangying Road Chaoyang District Beijing 100016 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Yao No. 7 Nanheyan Street Dongcheng District Beijing 100006 / CN | [2017/39] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [2023/13] |
Former [2017/39] | Kolster Oy Ab Salmisaarenaukio 1 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 14906626.8 | 18.11.2014 | [2017/39] | WO2014CN91425 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016077997 | Date: | 26.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3221579 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3221579 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.05.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F03D7/00, G01M13/00 | [2017/39] | CPC: |
F03D17/00 (EP,US);
G06N20/00 (EP,US);
F05B2260/80 (EP,US);
F05B2260/83 (EP,US);
F05B2260/84 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DES ZUSTANDS EINER WINDTURBINE | [2017/39] | English: | WIND TURBINE CONDITION MONITORING METHOD AND SYSTEM | [2017/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE CONTRÔLE D'ÉTAT DE TURBINE ÉOLIENNE | [2017/39] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2016 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/39] | 01.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.03.2023 | CZ | 29.03.2023 | DK | 29.03.2023 | EE | 29.03.2023 | HR | 29.03.2023 | LT | 29.03.2023 | LV | 29.03.2023 | MC | 29.03.2023 | NL | 29.03.2023 | PL | 29.03.2023 | RO | 29.03.2023 | RS | 29.03.2023 | SE | 29.03.2023 | SI | 29.03.2023 | SK | 29.03.2023 | SM | 29.03.2023 | NO | 29.06.2023 | GR | 30.06.2023 | IS | 29.07.2023 | PT | 31.07.2023 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
CZ | 29.03.2023 | ||
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SI | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
CZ | 29.03.2023 | ||
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | HR | 29.03.2023 | |
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | HR | 29.03.2023 | |
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | HR | 29.03.2023 | |
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | HR | 29.03.2023 | |
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 29.03.2023 | |
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 29.03.2023 | |
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 29.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011313726 (PARTHASARATHY GIRIJA [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,9-11,13,14 * paragraphs [0022] , [0023] , [0032] , [0033] , [0045] , [0046]; figures 1,2,8; claim 20 *[I] 4,8,12 | International search | [A]KR100954090B (WITHUS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2011313726 (PARTHASARATHY GIRIJA [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]CN102768115 (UNIV NORTH CHINA ELEC POWER) [A] 1-14 * description, paragraphs [0047] to [0203] and figures 1-4 *; | [A]CN103439091 (MAINTENANCE AND INSTALLATION BRANCH OF GUODIAN DADU RIVER HYDROPOWER DEV CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]CN103835882 (UNIV SHANGHAI DIANJI) [A] 1-14* the whole document * | Examination | US2011313726 |