EP3224788 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SELECTING INTERCHANGEABLE ANALYTICS MODULES TO PROVIDE CUSTOMIZED TAX RETURN PREPARATION INTERVIEWS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intuit Inc. 2700 Coast Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2017/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASCARO, Massimo c/o Intuit Inc. 2700 Coast Avenue Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 02 /
GOLDMAN, Jonathan R. c/o Intuit Inc. 2700 Coast Avenue Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 03 /
CABRERA, Luis Felipe c/o Intuit Inc. 2700 Coast Avenue Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 04 /
LAASER, William T. c/o Intuit Inc. 2700 Coast Avenue Mountain View, California 94043 / US | [2017/40] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/40] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 14906792.8 | 23.12.2014 | [2017/40] | WO2014US72242 | Priority number, date | US201414555491 | 26.11.2014 Original published format: US201414555491 | [2017/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016085524 | Date: | 02.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3224788 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q40/00, G06Q30/00 | [2018/20] | CPC: |
G06Q40/123 (EP,US);
G06Q30/016 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/40] | G06Q40/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR AUSWAHL AUSWECHSELBARER ANALYSEMODULE ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON INDIVIDUELLEN GESPRÄCHEN ZUR STEUERERKLÄRUNGSERSTELLUNG | [2017/40] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SELECTING INTERCHANGEABLE ANALYTICS MODULES TO PROVIDE CUSTOMIZED TAX RETURN PREPARATION INTERVIEWS | [2017/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE SÉLECTION DE MODULES ANALYTIQUES INTERCHANGEABLES POUR FOURNIR DES ENTRETIENS DE PRÉPARATION DE DÉCLARATION DE REVENUS PERSONNALISÉS | [2017/40] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2017 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 10.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/23] | 15.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US6021397 (JONES CHRISTOPHER L [US], et al) [A] 1-40* entire document *; | [A]US2007033116 (MURRAY DAVID K [US]) [A] 1-40 * entire document *; | [A]US7539635 (PEAK BRADLEY K [US], et al) [A] 1-40 * entire document *; | [XY]US2012109792 (EFTEKHARI AMIR R [US], et al) [X] 1-10, 13-26, 28-40 * entire document * [Y] 11, 12, 27; | [Y]US8190499 (MCVICKAR RICHARD E [US]) [Y] 11, 12, 27 * entire document * |