Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016090633 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014CN93708 | 12.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10751974 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2020 | B2 | US2017259526 | 14.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014CN93708 | 12.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6576451B | Global Dossier | 18.09.2019 | B2 | JP2018500206 | 11.01.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014CN93708 | 12.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107454873B | Global Dossier | 22.05.2020 | B | CN107454873 | 08.12.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014CN93708 | 12.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3230064 | Global Dossier | 26.08.2020 | B1 | EP3230064 | 27.06.2018 | A4 | EP3230064 | 18.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014CN93708 | 12.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR102847 | 29.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014CN93708 | 12.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112017011849 | 16.11.2021 | B1 | BR112017011849 | 27.02.2018 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2014CN93708 | 12.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CO2017005954 | 31.08.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2014CN93708 | 12.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2820504T | 21.04.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2014CN93708 | 12.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2017007076 | 05.09.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014CN93708 | 12.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3230064T | 25.01.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2014CN93708 | 12.12.2014 | EP14907628 | 12.12.2014 |