EP3232946 - SURGICAL STAPLING DEVICE WITH FIRING INDICATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2017/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAN, Hui Room 201 Building 98 Lane 125 Lian' An West Road Pudong District Shanghai 201204 / CN | 02 /
ZHOU, Junyu Room 502 Building 10 No. 639 Puxiu Road Pujiang Town Minhang District Shanghai 201114 / CN | 03 /
ZHOU, Shengwang Room 330 Building B School Of Mechanical Engineering Shanghai Jiaotong University No. 800 Dongchuan Road, Minhang District Shanghai 200240 / CN | [2017/43] | Representative(s) | Maschio & Soames IP Ltd 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [2017/43] | Application number, filing date | 14908147.3 | 17.12.2014 | [2017/43] | WO2014CN94007 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016095112 | Date: | 23.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3232946 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/115, A61B17/068 | [2017/43] | CPC: |
A61B17/1155 (EP,US);
A61B17/07207 (US);
A61B2017/07257 (US);
A61B2017/07278 (US);
A61B2090/0811 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHE KLAMMERVORRICHTUNG MIT AUSLÖSEINDIKATOR | [2017/43] | English: | SURGICAL STAPLING DEVICE WITH FIRING INDICATOR | [2017/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AGRAFAGE CHIRURGICAL AVEC INDICATEUR DE DÉCLENCHEMENT | [2017/43] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 14.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/43] | 14.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.10.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2009173767 (MILLIMAN KEITH L [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [X]US2013193187 (MILLIMAN KEITH L [US]) [X] 1-3, 8-16 * description, paragraphs [0034]-[0037], [0040]-[0046] and figures 1-8 *; | [A]CN103462663 (WUXI SHENKANG MED INSTR EQUIP CO LTD) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [A]CN203379170U (REACH SURGICAL INSTR CHINA CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]CN104042288 (COVIDIEN LP) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * |