EP3238964 - TIRE STATE MONITORING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd. 36-11 Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8685 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2017/44] | For all designated states The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd. 36-11 Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8685 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KODAMA, Yuji c/o The Yokohama Rubber Co. LTD. Hiratsuka Factory 2-1 Oiwake Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-8601 / JP | 02 /
NAKATANI, Koji c/o The Yokohama Rubber Co. LTD. Hiratsuka Factory 2-1 Oiwake Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-8601 / JP | [2017/44] | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [2020/04] |
Former [2017/44] | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstrasse 58 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14909057.3 | 26.12.2014 | [2017/44] | WO2014JP84534 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016103453 | Date: | 30.06.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3238964 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3238964 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60C23/04 | [2017/44] | CPC: |
B60C23/0406 (EP);
B60C23/0466 (US);
B60C23/04 (US);
B60C23/0452 (US);
B60C23/0462 (US);
B60C23/0479 (EP,US);
B60Q1/535 (EP);
B60C23/0444 (US);
B60C23/061 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REIFENZUSTANDSÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM | [2017/44] | English: | TIRE STATE MONITORING SYSTEM | [2017/44] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE DE L'ÉTAT DE PNEUS | [2017/44] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2017 | Translation filed | 22.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/44] | 22.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.12.2014 | AL | 22.01.2020 | AT | 22.01.2020 | CY | 22.01.2020 | CZ | 22.01.2020 | DK | 22.01.2020 | EE | 22.01.2020 | ES | 22.01.2020 | FI | 22.01.2020 | HR | 22.01.2020 | IT | 22.01.2020 | LT | 22.01.2020 | LV | 22.01.2020 | MC | 22.01.2020 | MK | 22.01.2020 | MT | 22.01.2020 | NL | 22.01.2020 | PL | 22.01.2020 | RO | 22.01.2020 | RS | 22.01.2020 | SE | 22.01.2020 | SI | 22.01.2020 | SK | 22.01.2020 | SM | 22.01.2020 | TR | 22.01.2020 | BG | 22.04.2020 | NO | 22.04.2020 | GR | 23.04.2020 | IS | 22.05.2020 | PT | 14.06.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 26.12.2014 | |
AL | 22.01.2020 | ||
AT | 22.01.2020 | ||
CY | 22.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
MT | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
TR | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 26.12.2014 | |
AT | 22.01.2020 | ||
CY | 22.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
MT | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
TR | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 22.01.2020 | |
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 22.01.2020 | |
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 22.01.2020 | |
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 22.01.2020 | |
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 22.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0300686 (LOTUS GROUP PLC [GB]) [X] 1,10 * column 2, line 40 - line 55 * [I] 2-9; | [XI]US2007159314 (ZHU SUSHENG [CN]) [X] 1,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0022] * [I] 2-9; | [XI]JP2008155795 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018] *[I] 2-9 | International search | [XY]JPS6441405 (LOTUS GROUP PLC) [X] 1 * , page 2, line 15 to page 3, line 4 & JP 64-41405 A & EP 300686 A2 * [Y] 2-10; | [Y]JP2005145385 (FUJITSU TEN LTD, et al) [Y] 9-10 * , paragraph [0062] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2005212791 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 2-10 * , claim 5; paragraphs [0006], [0055] & US 2003/0156021 A1 & EP 1980422 A2 *; | [Y]JP2006019908 (DENSO CORP) [Y] 3-10 * , paragraphs [0026], [0033], [0077], [0089], [0096] & US 2006/0001532 A1 *; | [XY]JP2006519722 (Beijing Times Bright China Electronic Technology Co., Ltd.) [X] 1, 10 * , paragraphs [0012], [0037] & US 2007/0159314 A1 & WO 2004/103739 A1 & CN 1458004 A & CA 2522575 A1 * [Y] 2-10; | [Y]JP2008112372 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 5-10 * , paragraphs [0035] to [0068] (Family: none) *; | [XY]JP2008155795 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1 * , paragraphs [0017] to [0018] (Family: none) * [Y] 2-10; | [Y]JP2009280081 (AKEBONO BRAKE IND) [Y] 2-10 * , claim 4 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2010188768 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 9-10 * , paragraph [0038] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2014223863 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 10* , paragraphs [0099], [0102] (Family: none) * |